EP1661371 - THREE-WAY CALL DETECTION USING STEGANOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSI-ITI, LLC 107 St. Francis Street, 33rd Floor Mobile, AL 36602 / US | [2010/32] |
Former [2006/22] | For all designated states Inmate Telephone, Inc. 4200 Industrial Park Drive Altoona, PA 16602 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIN, Thomas, J. 1006 W. College Avenue State College, PA 16801 / US | [2006/22] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/22] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04809530.1 | 04.08.2004 | [2006/22] | WO2004US25029 | Priority number, date | US20030492288P | 05.08.2003 Original published format: US 492288 P | [2006/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005025185 | Date: | 17.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1661371 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.05.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/42 | [2006/32] | CPC: |
H04M1/663 (EP,US);
H04M11/062 (EP,US);
H04M3/2281 (EP,US);
H04M1/665 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/22] | H04M1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DREIWEGE-VERBINDUNGSDETEKTION DURCH VERWENDUNG VON STEGANOGRAPHIE | [2006/22] | English: | THREE-WAY CALL DETECTION USING STEGANOGRAPHY | [2006/22] | French: | DETECTION DE CONFERENCE TELEPHONIQUE A TROIS FAISANT APPEL A LA STEGANOGRAPHIE | [2006/22] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 03.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 14.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/16] | 28.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.04.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4943973 (WERNER JEAN-JACQUES [US]) [X] 1-43* the whole document *; | [X]US5646940 (HOTTO ROBERT [US]) [X] 1-43 * abstract * * column 1, line 13 - column 3, line 47; figures 1-5 *; | [X]US2003040326 (LEVY KENNETH L [US], et al) [X] 1-43 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0106]; figures 2-5 * | International search | [A]US5539812 (KITCHIN DWIGHT W [US], et al) | [X] - NEWTON'S TELECOM DICTIONARY, 18TH EDITION., (200202), page 168, XP001237276 |