EP1668295 - DEVICE FOR STABILIZING COMBUSTION IN GAS TURBINE ENGINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2012/13] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2009/39] | For all designated states DELAVAN INC 811 Fourth Street West Des Moines Iowa 50265 / US | ||
For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | |||
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states DELAVAN INC 811 Fourth Street West Des Moines Iowa 50265 / US | ||
For all designated states Demag Delaval Industrial Turbomachinery AB 612 83 Finspong / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORNWELL, Michael 10016 Colorado Road South Bloomington, MN 55438 / US | 02 /
MILOSAVLJEVIC, Vladimir, D. S-61283 Finspong / SE | [2006/24] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/13] |
Former [2012/06] | Dietzen, Norbert Siemens AG CT IP F 1 Klaus-Bungert-Strasse 6 40468 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2006/24] | Charig, Raymond Julian, et al Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 04809669.7 | 03.09.2004 | [2006/24] | WO2004US28768 | Priority number, date | US20030500517P | 05.09.2003 Original published format: US 500517 P | [2006/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005040682 | Date: | 06.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1668295 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/28, F23R3/18, F23D14/74 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
F23R3/286 (EP,US);
F23R3/28 (KR);
F23D14/72 (KR);
F23D14/74 (EP,US);
F23R3/18 (EP,KR,US);
F23D2209/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2006/50] |
Former [2006/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR STABILISIERUNG DER VERBRENNUNG IN TURBOMOTOREN | [2006/24] | English: | DEVICE FOR STABILIZING COMBUSTION IN GAS TURBINE ENGINES | [2006/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF CON U POUR STABILISER LA COMBUSTION DANS DES TURBINES A GAZ | [2006/24] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 01.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/39] | 11.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6513329 (SNYDER TIMOTHY S [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7,20 * column 3, line 47 - column 4, line 35; figure 1 *; | [X]US2003150217 (GUTMARK EPHRAIM [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,7,10,20 * the whole document *; | [X]US6270337 (ETEMAD SHAHROKH [US], et al) [X] 1,3,20 * the whole document *; | [X]US5671597 (BUTLER AARON S [US], et al) [X] 1,20 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0491079 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [CH]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 25 - line 34; figure . *; | [A]US6070410 (DEAN ANTHONY JOHN [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0957311 (ALSTOM GAS TURBINES LTD [GB]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * |