EP1668382 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INTEGRATION OF WIRELESS COMPUTER NETWORK IN POSITION DETERMINING TECHNOLOGY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2006/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUM, Arnold J. 4610 Janet Place San Diego, CA 92115 / US | 02 /
PATRICK, Christopher 14358 Dalhousie Road San Diego, CA 92129 / US | [2006/24] | Representative(s) | Heselberger, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Heselberger, Johannes Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/24] | Heselberger, Johannes Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04809776.0 | 17.09.2004 | [2006/24] | WO2004US30797 | Priority number, date | US20030665747 | 19.09.2003 Original published format: US 665747 | [2006/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005029120 | Date: | 31.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1668382 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1668382 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/14, G01S5/02 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
G01S19/48 (EP,KR,US);
G01S19/09 (EP,KR,US);
G01S19/25 (EP,KR,US);
G01S5/14 (EP,KR,US);
H04W64/00 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR INTEGRATION EINES DRAHTLOSEN COMPUTERNETZWERKS IN POSITIONSBESTIMMUNGSTECHNOLOGIE | [2006/24] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INTEGRATION OF WIRELESS COMPUTER NETWORK IN POSITION DETERMINING TECHNOLOGY | [2006/24] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'INTEGRATION DE RESEAU D'ORDINATEURS SANS FIL DANS LA TECHNOLOGIE DE DETERMINATION DE POSITIONS | [2006/24] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 30.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.11.2009 | 25.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.05.2010 | BE | 19.05.2010 | CY | 19.05.2010 | CZ | 19.05.2010 | DK | 19.05.2010 | EE | 19.05.2010 | NL | 19.05.2010 | PL | 19.05.2010 | PT | 19.05.2010 | RO | 19.05.2010 | SI | 19.05.2010 | SK | 19.05.2010 | TR | 19.05.2010 | BG | 19.08.2010 | GR | 20.08.2010 | IE | 17.09.2010 | LU | 17.09.2010 | CH | 30.09.2010 | LI | 30.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | HU | 20.11.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2013/32] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
BE | 19.05.2010 | ||
BG | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PT | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
TR | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
IE | 17.09.2010 | ||
LU | 17.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 20.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
BE | 19.05.2010 | ||
BG | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
TR | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
IE | 17.09.2010 | ||
LU | 17.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 20.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
BE | 19.05.2010 | ||
BG | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
IE | 17.09.2010 | ||
LU | 17.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 20.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
BE | 19.05.2010 | ||
BG | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
IE | 17.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 20.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
BE | 19.05.2010 | ||
BG | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
IE | 17.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
BE | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
IE | 17.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
BE | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
BE | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
SI | 19.05.2010 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6249252 (DUPRAY DENNIS J [US]) [Y] 17-28,38,39,48,49 * column 17, line 34 - column 25, line 34; figure 5 *; | [Y]US6252543 (CAMP WILLIAM O [US]) [Y] 17-28,38,39,48,49 * column 11, line 44 - column 13, line 9; figure 5 ** column 14, lines 12-34 *; | [XY]WO0150151 (BRIGHTCOM TECHNOLOGIES LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1,2,4-16,29-37,40-47 * page 12, line 22 - page 19, line 24; figures 4-10 * [Y] 17-28,38,39,48,49; | [XY]US2002082024 (BAJIKAR SUNDEEP [US]) [X] 1-16,29-37,40-47 * paragraphs [0023] - [0030]; figure 5 * [Y] 17-28,38,39,48,49; | [XY]US2002154060 (SMITH DANIEL N [US]) [X] 1,2,4-16,29-37,40-47 * paragraphs [0031] - [0033]; figure 6 * [Y] 17-28,38,39,48,49; | [XY]US2003134657 (NORTA HEIKKI [FI], et al) [X] 1,2,4-16,29-37,40-47 * paragraphs [0022] - [0024] - [0035] - [0039]; figure 1 * [Y] 17-28,38,39,48,49 | Examination | WO0131966 | US6256498 |