EP1732580 - EPHA2 VACCINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.2008 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEDIMMUNE, INC. One MedImmune Way Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | [2006/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KINCH, Michael, S. 19627 Hoover Farm Drive Laytonsville, MD 20882 / US | [2006/51] | Representative(s) | Chapman, Paul Gilmour, et al Marks & Clerk LLP The Beacon 176 St Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Chapman, Paul Gilmour, et al Marks & Clerk 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | ||
Former [2007/14] | Chapman, Paul Gilmour, et al Marks & Clerk 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | ||
Former [2006/51] | Chapman, Paul Gilmour Marks & Clerk 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 04809990.7 | 15.10.2004 | [2006/51] | WO2004US34693 | Priority number, date | US20030532696P | 24.12.2003 Original published format: US 532696 P | US20040602588P | 18.08.2004 Original published format: US 602588 P | US20040615548P | 01.10.2004 Original published format: US 615548 P | US20040617564P | 07.10.2004 Original published format: US 617564 P | [2006/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005067460 | Date: | 28.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1732580 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, A61K31/70, A61K39/395, A01N63/00, A01N37/18, A01N43/04, A01N65/00 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
A61K47/6425 (EP);
A61K39/001122 (EP,US);
A61K47/644 (EP);
A61K47/6901 (EP);
A61K2035/122 (EP);
A61K2039/52 (EP);
A61K2039/523 (EP);
A61K2039/5256 (EP);
A61K2039/53 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EPHA2-IMPFSTOFFE | [2006/51] | English: | EPHA2 VACCINES | [2006/51] | French: | VACCINS EPHA2 | [2006/51] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/51] | 29.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.12.2006 | 31.10.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03094859 (MEDIMMUNE INC [US], et al); |