EP1682044 - ELECTROACTIVE POLYMER ACTUATED SHEATH FOR IMPLANTABLE OR INSERTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited P.O. Box 1317 Seaston House Hastings Christ Church Barbados, West Indies / BB | [2006/48] |
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Corporate Centre Bush Hill, Bay Street St. Michael / BB | ||
Former [2006/30] | For all designated states SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS, INC. 8200 SciMed Place Maple Grove, Minnesota 55311 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATTISON, Richard, Carlton 14215 288th Avenue NW Zimmerman, MI 55398-9105 / US | [2006/30] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/17] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/17] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstraße 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/05] | Jungblut, Bernhard Jakob, et al JUNGBLUT & SEUSS Patentanwälte Max-Dohrn-Strasse 10 10589 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2006/30] | Jungblut, Bernhard Jakob, et al Albrecht, Lüke & Jungblut, Patentanwälte, Gelfertstrasse 56 14195 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 04810377.4 | 04.11.2004 | [2006/30] | WO2004US36858 | Priority number, date | US20030702314 | 06.11.2003 Original published format: US 702314 | [2006/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005046525 | Date: | 26.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1682044 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1682044 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
A61F2/962 (EP,US);
A61F2/95 (EP,US);
A61F2/966 (EP,US);
A61L31/14 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00871 (EP,US);
A61F2002/9583 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROAKTIVE POLYMER-BETÄTIGTE HÜLLE FÜR EIN IMPLANTIERBARES ODER EINFÜHRBARES MEDIZINPRODUKT | [2006/30] | English: | ELECTROACTIVE POLYMER ACTUATED SHEATH FOR IMPLANTABLE OR INSERTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE | [2006/30] | French: | GAINE COMMANDEE PAR POLYMERE ELECTROACTIF POUR DISPOSITIF MEDICAL IMPLANTABLE OU INSERABLE | [2006/30] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 25.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/14] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.05.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 19.05.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.06.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.04.2011 | BE | 27.04.2011 | CY | 27.04.2011 | CZ | 27.04.2011 | DK | 27.04.2011 | EE | 27.04.2011 | FI | 27.04.2011 | HU | 27.04.2011 | IT | 27.04.2011 | NL | 27.04.2011 | PL | 27.04.2011 | RO | 27.04.2011 | SE | 27.04.2011 | SI | 27.04.2011 | SK | 27.04.2011 | TR | 27.04.2011 | BG | 27.07.2011 | GR | 28.07.2011 | ES | 07.08.2011 | IS | 27.08.2011 | PT | 29.08.2011 | GB | 04.11.2011 | LU | 04.11.2011 | CH | 30.11.2011 | FR | 30.11.2011 | LI | 30.11.2011 | MC | 30.11.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
TR | 27.04.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
GB | 04.11.2011 | ||
LU | 04.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
GB | 04.11.2011 | ||
LU | 04.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
GB | 04.11.2011 | ||
LU | 04.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/04] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
GB | 04.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/46] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
GB | 04.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/29] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | PT | 29.08.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2001001833 (RAVENSCROFT ADRIAN C [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0022] , [0023] *; | [XI]US6264671 (STACK RICHARD S [US], et al) [X] 1,6,11,16,19,20 * column 8, lines 17-39; figures 3,4a,4b * [I] 4,5,9-15; | [A]US6447540 (FONTAINE ARTHUR B [US], et al) [A] 1* column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 6 *; | [XI]US6514237 (MASEDA LUIS J [US]) [X] 1,6,9,11-16 * column 2, lines 26-57 * * column 7, line 58 - column 8, line 2; figure 8 * [I] 2,3,5,7,8,10,19,20; | [XI]US2003069474 (COUVILLON LUCIEN ALFRED [US]) [X] 1,4-6,9,10 * paragraphs [0025] , [0028] , [0033] , [0035] , [0040] - [0045]; figures 1-8 * [I] 2,3,7,8,12-15 | by applicant | US6249076 |