EP1682407 - OUTBOARD JET DRIVE MARINE PROPULSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sword Marine Technology LLC 1815-N. US Highway 1 Ormond Beach, FL 32174 / US | [2006/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAWSON, William 1815 N. US Highway 1 Ormond Beach, FL 32174 / US | [2006/30] | Representative(s) | Pedder, James Cuthbert Regent House 1-3 Queensway Redhill Surrey RH1 1QT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/30] | Pedder, James Cuthbert Crown House, 2-8 Gloucester Road Redhill Surrey RH1 1FH / GB | Application number, filing date | 04810983.9 | 15.11.2004 | [2006/30] | WO2004US38048 | Priority number, date | US20030520387P | 13.11.2003 Original published format: US 520387 P | US20040988327 | 12.11.2004 Original published format: US 988327 | [2006/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005049419 | Date: | 02.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1682407 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B63H11/00, B63H11/08, B63H11/11 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
B63H11/08 (EP,KR,US);
B63H11/00 (KR);
B63H11/11 (KR);
B63H20/32 (EP,US);
B63H11/107 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSSENBORD-STRAHLANTRIEBSSCHIFFSANTRIEBSSYSTEM | [2006/30] | English: | OUTBOARD JET DRIVE MARINE PROPULSION SYSTEM | [2006/30] | French: | SYSTEME HORS-BORD DE PROPULSION MARINE PAR REACTION | [2006/30] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2006 | Search fee paid | 05.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 03.06.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.01.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2003032344 (BLANCHARD CLARENCE E [US]); | [X]US5938490 (RODLER WALDO E [US]); | [X]US4457724 (MIYAMOTO YASUHIKO [JP]); | [Y]US6454621 (MATSUDA YOSHIMOTO [JP]) | by applicant | US3055175 | US5356319 | US6398600 |