EP1689250 - FROZEN FOOD MASTICATING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.2010 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zweben, Arnold P. 2422 Bent Tree Road, Suite 2717 Palm Harbor, FL 34683 / US | [2006/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/33] | Representative(s) | Derry, Paul Stefan Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/09] | Derry, Paul Stefan Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | ||
Former [2006/33] | Tomkinson, Alexandra Bailey Walsh & Co 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 04811181.9 | 17.11.2004 | [2006/33] | WO2004US38365 | Priority number, date | US20030523168P | 18.11.2003 Original published format: US 523168 P | [2006/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005048745 | Date: | 02.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1689250 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.08.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A23G9/22, A23G9/32, A23G9/42, A23G9/12, A47J19/00 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
A23G9/224 (EP,US);
A23G9/12 (EP,US);
A23G9/22 (EP,US);
A23G9/32 (EP,US);
A23G9/42 (EP,US);
A47J19/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/33] | A23L1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZERKLEINERUNGSGERÄT FÜR GEFRORENE NAHRUNGSMITTEL | [2006/33] | English: | FROZEN FOOD MASTICATING MACHINE | [2006/33] | French: | MACHINE DE MASTICATION D'ALIMENTS CONGELES | [2006/33] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 05.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/33] | 23.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/48] | 02.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4948614 (FELDPAUSCH DAVID [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5246175 (FELDPAUSCH DAVID [US]) [DA] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5906154 (YOON JEONG KYU [KR], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]US6171634 (MARJANOVIC NICOLAS [FR], et al) [X] 9 * example 3 *; | [A]US2003154867 (KIM YOUNG-KI [KR]) [A] 1-9* the whole document * | International search | [A]US2513974 (THOMAS MATTHEW J); | [A]US2864419 (WOOCK WALTER R J); | [A]US3976001 (TROVINGER HARRY R) |