EP1680519 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR GLIOMA CLASSIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Exagen Diagnostics, Inc. 801 University Boulevard, SE, Suite 209 Albuquerque, NM 87106 / US | [2006/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARRIS, Cole 16375 Havenpark Drive Houston, Texas 77059 / US | 02 /
DAVIS, Lisa 600 Vassar Drive. NE Albuquerque, NM 87106 / US | [2006/38] |
Former [2006/29] | 01 /
HARRIS, Cole 801 University Blvd., S.E. Albuquerque, NM 87108 / US | ||
02 /
DAVIS, Lisa 600 Vassar Drive. NE Albuquerque, NM 87106 / US | Representative(s) | Schnappauf, Georg, et al ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Schnappauf, Georg, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/29] | Schnappauf, Georg, et al Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04811196.7 | 03.11.2004 | [2006/29] | WO2004US38393 | Priority number, date | US20030516817P | 03.11.2003 Original published format: US 516817 P | [2006/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005042786 | Date: | 12.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1680519 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2006/29] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/112 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR GLIOMA KLASSIFIZIERUNG | [2006/29] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR GLIOMA CLASSIFICATION | [2006/29] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCEDES DE CLASSIFICATION DES GLIOMES | [2006/29] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/29] | 08.09.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A] - POLLACK J R ET AL, "Genome-wide analysis of DNA copy-number changes using cDNA microarrays", NATURE GENETICS, NATURE AMERICA, NEW YORK, US, (199909), vol. 23, no. 1, ISSN 1061-4036, pages 41 - 46, XP002221379 [A] 1-21 * abstract * * page 45, column 1, paragraph 4 - column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/14385 | [A] - HANASH S M ET AL, "INTEGRATING CANCER GENOMICS AND PROTEOMICS IN THE POST-GENOME ERA", PROTEOMICS, (200201), vol. 2, no. 1, pages 69 - 75, XP008015149 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1615-9861(200201)2:1<69::AID-PROT69>3.0.CO;2-8 | [A] - KIM SEUNGCHAN ET AL, "Identification of combination gene sets for glioma classification.", MOLECULAR CANCER THERAPEUTICS, (200211), vol. 1, no. 13, ISSN 1535-7163, pages 1229 - 1236, XP002333919 [A] 1-21 * abstract * | [T] - NIGRO JANICE M ET AL, "Integrated array-comparative genomic hybridization and expression array profiles identify clinically relevant molecular subtypes of glioblastoma.", CANCER RESEARCH. 1 MAR 2005, (20050301), vol. 65, no. 5, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 1678 - 1686, XP002333920 [T] * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-04-2921 | [AD] - NUTT CATHERINE L ET AL, "Gene expression-based classification of malignant gliomas correlates better with survival than histological classification.", CANCER RESEARCH, (20030401), vol. 63, no. 7, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 1602 - 1607, XP002333921 [AD] 1-21 * abstract * |