EP1701793 - A CATALYST SYSTEM FOR ETHYLENE (CO)-POLYMERIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2018 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Formosa Plastics Corporation, U.S.A. 9 Peach Tree Hill Road Livingston, NJ 07039-5702 / US | [2006/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONG, Gapgoung 634 Avery Dr. Sugar Land, TX 77479-5713 / US | 02 /
LU, Honglan 103 Biloxi Street Port Lavaca, TX 77979-4908 / US | [2006/38] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2017/26] |
Former [2006/38] | Bublak, Wolfgang, et al European Patent Attorney Bardehle, Pagenberg, Dost, Altenburg, Geissler Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04811205.6 | 16.11.2004 | [2006/38] | WO2004US38415 | Priority number, date | US20030726837 | 03.12.2003 Original published format: US 726837 | [2006/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005061109 | Date: | 07.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1701793 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1701793 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.07.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01J31/12, B01J37/00, C08F4/02, C08F8/00, C08L27/00, C08L63/00, B01J31/14, B01J31/22, C08F10/02, C08F110/02, C08F210/16 | [2017/02] | CPC: |
B01J31/128 (EP,US);
B01J31/122 (EP,US);
B01J31/143 (EP,US);
B01J31/2295 (EP,US);
C08F10/02 (EP,US);
B01J2531/46 (EP,US);
B01J2531/48 (EP,US);
B01J2531/56 (EP,US);
C08F110/02 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F10/02, C08F4/651 (US,EP);
C08F10/02, C08F4/6557 (EP,US);
C08F110/02, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/18, C08F2500/24 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/18, C08F2500/24 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2006/38] | B01J31/00, B01J37/00, C08F4/02, C08F8/00, C08L27/00, C08L63/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/26] |
Former [2006/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KATALYSATORSYSTEM FÜR DIE ETHYLEN(CO)POLYMERISATION | [2006/38] | English: | A CATALYST SYSTEM FOR ETHYLENE (CO)-POLYMERIZATION | [2006/38] | French: | SYSTEME CATALYTIQUE POUR COPOLYMERISATION D'ETHYLENE | [2006/38] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2006 | Search fee paid | 03.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 24.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 05.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   27.01.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.11.2004 | CY | 28.06.2017 | CZ | 28.06.2017 | DK | 28.06.2017 | EE | 28.06.2017 | MC | 28.06.2017 | PL | 28.06.2017 | PT | 28.06.2017 | RO | 28.06.2017 | SI | 28.06.2017 | SK | 28.06.2017 | TR | 28.06.2017 | BG | 28.09.2017 | GR | 29.09.2017 | IS | 28.10.2017 | IE | 16.11.2017 | LU | 16.11.2017 | CH | 30.11.2017 | LI | 30.11.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 16.11.2004 | |
CY | 28.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
TR | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
IE | 16.11.2017 | ||
LU | 16.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 16.11.2004 | |
CY | 28.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
IE | 16.11.2017 | ||
LU | 16.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 16.11.2004 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
IE | 16.11.2017 | ||
LU | 16.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
IE | 16.11.2017 | ||
LU | 16.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
LU | 16.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 28.06.2017 | |
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | BG | 28.09.2017 | |
GR | 29.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6204216 (NAGY SANDOR [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002115800 (KONG GAP-GOUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-28 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraphs [0033] , [0082]; examples 1,3; claims 1-25; table 1 *; | [PY]WO2004072121 (FORMOSA PLASTICS CORP USA [US]) [PY] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [PY]WO2004072122 (FORMOSA PLASTICS CORP USA [US]) [PY] 1-28* the whole document * | International search | [Y]US6271165 (JACOBSEN GRANT B [US], et al); | [Y]US6403518 (WARD DAVID GEORGE [US]) |