EP1706864 - COMPUTATIONALLY EFFICIENT BACKGROUND NOISE SUPPRESSOR FOR SPEECH CODING AND SPEECH RECOGNITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, PT | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Skyworks Solutions, Inc. 5221 California Avenue Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [2006/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOU-GHAZALE, Sahar 38 Capenteria Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [2006/40] | Representative(s) | Lloyd, Patrick Alexander Desmond, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/11] | Lloyd, Patrick Alexander Desmond, et al Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2012/02] | Walaski, Jan Filip Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | ||
Former [2010/22] | Walaski, Jan Filip Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | ||
Former [2010/14] | Brown, Alexander Edward Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | ||
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/03] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/40] | Kindermann, Peter Kindermann Patentanwälte Postfach 100234 85593 Baldham / DE | Application number, filing date | 04811396.3 | 18.11.2004 | [2006/40] | WO2004US38675 | Priority number, date | US20030724430 | 28.11.2003 Original published format: US 724430 | [2006/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005055197 | Date: | 16.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1706864 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1706864 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G10L21/02 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
G10L21/0208 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/40] | G10L/ | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/40] | Title | German: | RECHNERISCH EFFIZIENTER HINTERGRUNDRAUSCHUNTERDRÜCKER FÜR DIE SPRACHCODIERUNG UND SPRACHERKENNUNG | [2006/40] | English: | COMPUTATIONALLY EFFICIENT BACKGROUND NOISE SUPPRESSOR FOR SPEECH CODING AND SPEECH RECOGNITION | [2006/40] | French: | SUPPRESSEUR DE BRUIT DE FOND A CALCUL EFFICACE POUR LE CODAGE DE LA PAROLE ET LA RECONNAISSANCE VOCALE | [2006/40] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2006 | Search fee paid | 31.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 31.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/40] | 24.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.07.2011 | 18.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12150622.4 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 11.02.2012 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.11.2004 | AT | 11.01.2012 | BE | 11.01.2012 | CY | 11.01.2012 | CZ | 11.01.2012 | DK | 11.01.2012 | EE | 11.01.2012 | FI | 11.01.2012 | IT | 11.01.2012 | NL | 11.01.2012 | PL | 11.01.2012 | PT | 11.01.2012 | RO | 11.01.2012 | SE | 11.01.2012 | SI | 11.01.2012 | SK | 11.01.2012 | TR | 11.01.2012 | BG | 11.04.2012 | GR | 12.04.2012 | ES | 22.04.2012 | IS | 11.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
TR | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
ES | 22.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
ES | 22.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | SI | 11.01.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6415253 (JOHNSON STEVEN A [US]) [A] 1-21 * column 1, lines 52-60 ** column 2, lines 51-62 *; | [A]US2003078772 (WU KUO-GUAN [TW], et al) [A] 1-21 * paragraphs [0009] - [0011] - [0014] , [0018] - [0025] *; | [A] - BEROUTI M ET AL, "ENHANCEMENT OF SPEECH CORRUPTED BY ACOUSTIC NOISE", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH & SIGNAL PROCESSING. ICASSP. WASHINGTON, APRIL 2 - 4, 1979, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (1979), vol. CONF. 4, pages 208 - 211, XP001079151 [A] 1-21 * page 208, column R, lines 34-37 * * page 210, column L, lines 14-16 * * Eq. 3 and 4 * * figure 2 * | International search | [A]US5839101 (VAEHAETALO ANTTI [FI], et al); | [X]US6324502 (HANDEL PETER [SE], et al) |