EP1696824 - RAPID EXCHANGE CATHETERS WITH TANDEM LUMENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2012/50] |
Former [2012/04] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | ||
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states ev3 Inc. 4600 Nathan Lane North Plymouth, MN 55442-2920 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLUBB, Thomas 554 Perch Lake Road Hudson, WI 54016 / US | [2006/36] | Representative(s) | Gray, James, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/02] | Gray, James, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2011/37] | Gray, James, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2008/01] | Howe, Steven, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2006/36] | Howe, Steven Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 04812046.3 | 24.11.2004 | [2006/36] | WO2004US39443 | Priority number, date | US20030724816 | 01.12.2003 Original published format: US 724816 | [2006/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005053573 | Date: | 16.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1696824 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1696824 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/01, A61F2/06 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
A61F2/011 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0006 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0008 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0183 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/36] | Title | German: | SCHNELLWECHSEL-KATHETER MIT TANDEM-LUMEN | [2006/36] | English: | RAPID EXCHANGE CATHETERS WITH TANDEM LUMENS | [2006/36] | French: | CATHETER A REMPLACEMENT RAPIDE AVEC DES LUMIERES EN TANDEM | [2006/36] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 04.09.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.11.2004 | AT | 07.01.2015 | BE | 07.01.2015 | CY | 07.01.2015 | CZ | 07.01.2015 | DK | 07.01.2015 | EE | 07.01.2015 | FI | 07.01.2015 | MC | 07.01.2015 | PL | 07.01.2015 | PT | 07.01.2015 | RO | 07.01.2015 | SE | 07.01.2015 | SI | 07.01.2015 | SK | 07.01.2015 | TR | 07.01.2015 | BG | 07.04.2015 | GR | 08.04.2015 | IS | 07.05.2015 | [2018/34] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 24.11.2004 | |
AT | 07.01.2015 | ||
BE | 07.01.2015 | ||
CY | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
TR | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
BE | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
BE | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 07.01.2015 | |
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 07.01.2015 | |
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2003125751 (GRIFFIN PATRICK [IE], et al) [X] 1,3-6,11-16,29,30,32,33,35,36,39-44 * paragraph [0149] - paragraph [0313]; figures 1,2,6,15-17,20,21 * [Y] 2,37; | [YA]US2003171770 (KUSLEIKA RICHARD S [US], et al) [Y] 2,37 * paragraph [0046]; figures 4,5,11-13,15,28 * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0088] * [A] 1,3-36,38-44,74; | [A]US5769816 (BARBUT DENISE [US], et al) [A] 1-44,74 * column 16, line 39 - column 20, line 65; figures 6,7 *; | [X]US2003109886 (KEEGAN MARTIN [IE], et al) [X] 39-41,43 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0152]; compounds 2,3,17,19,28 *; | [A]EP0321912 (DELSANTI GERARD L) [A] 1-44,74 * column 5, line 2 - column 5, line 40; figure 4 * | Examination | US5662671 | US5053008 | by applicant | US4762129 | US2002111649 | US20030354831 | US20020171704 | US20030460750 |