EP1709151 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR PROPAGATION OF NEURAL PROGENITOR CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celavie Biosciences, LLC 722 Hiesters Lane Reading PA 19605 / US | [2008/12] |
Former [2006/41] | For all designated states Catholic Healthcare West 251 S. Lake Avenue, 8th Floor Pasadena CA 91101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOPYOV, Oleg, V. 12416 Willow Grove Court Moorpark, CA 93021 / US | [2006/41] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/15] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/41] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04812676.7 | 02.12.2004 | [2006/41] | WO2004US40224 | Priority number, date | US20030526242P | 02.12.2003 Original published format: US 526242 P | [2006/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005056755 | Date: | 23.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1709151 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1709151 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/00, C12N5/0797, A01N1/02 | [2015/29] | CPC: |
C12N5/0623 (EP,US);
A01N1/0221 (EP,US);
A01N1/0226 (EP,US);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
C12N2500/14 (EP,US);
C12N2501/11 (EP,US);
C12N2501/115 (EP,US);
C12N2501/148 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/35] | C12N5/00, C12N5/08, C12N5/10, C12N5/22 | ||
Former IPC [2006/41] | C12N1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/15] |
Former [2006/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERMEHRUNG NEURALER PROGENITORZELLEN | [2006/41] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR PROPAGATION OF NEURAL PROGENITOR CELLS | [2006/41] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCEDES DE PROPAGATION DE CELLULES PROGENITRICES NEURONALES | [2006/41] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 26.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/41] | 27.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.12.2004 | AT | 13.04.2016 | BE | 13.04.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | CY | 13.04.2016 | CZ | 13.04.2016 | DK | 13.04.2016 | EE | 13.04.2016 | FI | 13.04.2016 | IS | 13.04.2016 | LT | 13.04.2016 | MC | 13.04.2016 | PL | 13.04.2016 | RO | 13.04.2016 | SI | 13.04.2016 | SK | 13.04.2016 | TR | 13.04.2016 | GR | 14.07.2016 | PT | 16.08.2016 | IE | 02.12.2016 | LU | 02.12.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 02.12.2004 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
TR | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 02.12.2016 | ||
LU | 02.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 02.12.2004 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
TR | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 02.12.2016 | ||
LU | 02.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 02.12.2004 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 02.12.2016 | ||
LU | 02.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 02.12.2016 | ||
LU | 02.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 13.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9410292 (NEUROSPHERES LTD [CA]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003166276 (CARPENTER MELISSA [US]) [A] 1-21* the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5753506 (JOHE KARL K [US]); | [Y] - VAN LEEUWEN ET AL., "Role of Extracellular Calcium in the Regulation of 1,25-dihydroxyvitamin D3 Formation in Cultured Human Keratinocytes", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (199412), vol. 1221, no. 2, pages 167 - 170, XP008092140 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-4889(94)90009-4 | Examination | WO0212452 | - "DMEM:Ham F12 1:1 Formulation", (20140427), Lonza #12-719, URL: http://bio.lonza.com/uploads/tx_mwaxmarketingmaterial/Lonza_ProductDataSheets_Formulation_-_DMEMF-12_11_Mixture_12-719.pdf, (20140821), XP055135750 |