EP1694202 - INTELLIGENT MEDICAL VIGILANCE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hoana Medical, Inc. 828 Fort Street Mall Suite 620 Honolulu, HI 96813 / US | [2014/50] |
Former [2006/35] | For all designated states Hoana Medical, Inc. 1001 Bishop Street, Suite 2828, Pacific Tower Honolulu, HI 96813-2833 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SULLIVAN, Patrick, K. 368 Dune Circle Kailua, HI 96734 / US | 02 /
GLEI, Matthew, S. 801 S. King Street, Apt. 1009 Honolulu, HI 96813 / US | 03 /
EMBREE, Paul, M. 55 S. Kukui Street, Apt. D-1407 Honolulu, HI 96813 / US | [2006/35] | Representative(s) | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2015/01] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Alcalá 35 28014 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2006/35] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L., Alcalá, 35 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 04812817.7 | 03.12.2004 | [2006/35] | WO2004US40379 | Priority number, date | US20030526612P | 04.12.2003 Original published format: US 526612 P | [2006/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005055824 | Date: | 23.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1694202 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1694202 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2015/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, G08B23/00, G06F19/00, G08B21/04 | [2009/23] | CPC: |
A61B5/0205 (EP,US);
A61B5/002 (EP,US);
A61B5/6892 (EP,US);
G16H40/63 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0204 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0247 (EP,US);
A61B2562/046 (EP,US);
A61B5/01 (EP,US);
A61B5/02455 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/35] | A61B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/35] | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTES MEDIZINISCHES ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM | [2006/35] | English: | INTELLIGENT MEDICAL VIGILANCE SYSTEM | [2006/35] | French: | SYSTEME DE SURVEILLANCE MEDICALE INTELLIGENT | [2006/35] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2006 | Search fee paid | 03.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/35] | 29.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/50] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.05.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 13.05.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.05.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   17.06.2010 | 31.12.2010 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   20.06.2011 | 31.12.2011 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   22.06.2012 | 31.12.2012 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.2013 | 31.12.2013 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   02.06.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.12.2004 | AT | 31.12.2014 | BE | 31.12.2014 | BG | 31.12.2014 | CY | 31.12.2014 | CZ | 31.12.2014 | DK | 31.12.2014 | EE | 31.12.2014 | ES | 31.12.2014 | FI | 31.12.2014 | IT | 31.12.2014 | LT | 31.12.2014 | MC | 31.12.2014 | NL | 31.12.2014 | PL | 31.12.2014 | PT | 31.12.2014 | RO | 31.12.2014 | SE | 31.12.2014 | SI | 31.12.2014 | SK | 31.12.2014 | TR | 31.12.2014 | GR | 01.04.2015 | IS | 30.04.2015 | [2018/37] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 03.12.2004 | |
AT | 31.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
BG | 31.12.2014 | ||
CY | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
TR | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 31.12.2014 | |
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/29] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 31.12.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US5585785 (GWIN RONNIE [US], et al); | [X]US5724025 (TAVORI ITZCHAK [IL]); | [Y]US6468234 (VAN DER LOOS H F MACHIEL [US], et al) | by applicant | US5585785 | US5724025 |