EP1695571 - ROAMING INDICATORS FOR MULTI-MODE WIRELESS COMMUNICATION DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2012 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Motorola Mobility, Inc. 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | [2011/09] |
Former [2006/35] | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AERRABOTU, Naveen 7943 Dada Drive Gurnee, IL 60031 / US | 02 /
DROSTE, Scott, T. 1404 Loch Lomond Drive Crystal Lake, IL 60014 / US | [2006/35] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2006/35] | Kuhnen & Wacker Intellectual Property Law Firm Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 04812892.0 | 03.12.2004 | [2006/35] | WO2004US40468 | Priority number, date | US20030736270 | 15.12.2003 Original published format: US 736270 | [2006/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005060562 | Date: | 07.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1695571 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1695571 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.01.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/08 | [2011/04] | CPC: |
H04W48/08 (EP,US);
H04W48/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/35] | H04Q7/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROAMING-INDIKATOREN FÜR DRAHTLOSE MULTIMODUS-KOMMUNIKATIONSGERÄTE | [2006/35] | English: | ROAMING INDICATORS FOR MULTI-MODE WIRELESS COMMUNICATION DEVICES | [2006/35] | French: | INDICATEURS ITINERANTS POUR DES DISPOSITIFS DE COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL MULTIMODES | [2006/35] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2006 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/35] | 25.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.08.2011 | BE | 17.08.2011 | CY | 17.08.2011 | CZ | 17.08.2011 | DK | 17.08.2011 | EE | 17.08.2011 | FI | 17.08.2011 | HU | 17.08.2011 | LT | 17.08.2011 | NL | 17.08.2011 | PL | 17.08.2011 | RO | 17.08.2011 | SE | 17.08.2011 | SI | 17.08.2011 | SK | 17.08.2011 | TR | 17.08.2011 | BG | 17.11.2011 | GR | 18.11.2011 | IE | 03.12.2011 | LU | 03.12.2011 | IS | 17.12.2011 | PT | 19.12.2011 | CH | 31.12.2011 | LI | 31.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
TR | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IE | 03.12.2011 | ||
LU | 03.12.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IE | 03.12.2011 | ||
LU | 03.12.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IE | 03.12.2011 | ||
LU | 03.12.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IE | 03.12.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IE | 03.12.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 17.08.2011 | |
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 17.08.2011 | |
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 17.08.2011 | |
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5442806 (BARBER CLIFTON J [US], et al); | [A]US5950130 (COURSEY CAMERON KELLY [US]) [A] 1-18 * column 18, line 16 - column 19, line 6 * * column 29, lines 1-43 *; | [A]DE19831407 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-18 * column 8, line 9 - line 64 * * column 11, line 20 - line 42 *; | [A]WO0163944 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [PX]WO2004034623 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [PX] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO2004054299 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [PX] 1-18* paragraphs [1028] - [1037] - [1046] , [1047] , [1079] - [1084] * | International search | [A] - "Over-the-air service provisioning of mobile stations in spread spectrum systems", TIA/EIA/IS-683-A;19, (199804), XP002133149 | by applicant | WO2004054299 |