EP1697822 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DISPLAYING A CURSOR ON A TRADING SCREEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.11.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trading Technologies International, Inc. 222 S. Riverside Plaza Suite 1100 Chicago Illinois 60606 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states Trading Technologies International, Inc 222 S. Riverside Plaza, Suite 1100 Chicago Illinois 60606 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHLUETTER, Jens-Uwe Stresenmannstrasse 1h Koenigstein/Ts / DE | 02 /
WEST, Robert A. 7059 N. Wolcott Chicago, IL 60626 / US | [2006/36] | Representative(s) | McCann, Heather Alison, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | McCann, Heather Alison, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2006/36] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 04813087.6 | 03.12.2004 | [2006/36] | WO2004US40708 | Priority number, date | US20030729123 | 05.12.2003 Original published format: US 729123 | [2006/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005057353 | Date: | 23.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1697822 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.04.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/00, G06Q30/00, G06F3/048, G06Q40/00, G06Q20/10, G06F3/0481 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
G06F3/04812 (EP,US);
G06F3/00 (GB,KR);
G06F3/04847 (US);
G06F3/03 (KR);
G06F3/04842 (US);
G06F3/14 (KR);
G06Q20/10 (EP,US);
G06Q40/00 (EP,US);
G06Q40/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/36] | G06F3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM ANZEIGEN EINES CURSORS AUF EINEM HANDELSBILDSCHIRM | [2006/36] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DISPLAYING A CURSOR ON A TRADING SCREEN | [2006/36] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'AFFICHAGE D'UN CURSEUR SUR UN ECRAN DE TRANSACTIONS | [2006/36] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2006 | Search fee paid | 26.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 20.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.07.2017 | 04.07.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/50] | 03.08.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2003189670 (KENNEDY HOWARD [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 3 - page 1, paragraph 10 * * page 2, paragraph 24 - page 2, paragraph 24 * * page 3, paragraph 38 - page 4, paragraph 58 ** figures 4-5 * | International search | [Y]US5598183 (ROBERTSON KENNETH R [US], et al); | [X]US2002120551 (JONES CLARKSON [US]) |