EP1706693 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RECLAIMING EFFLUENT FROM A FREEZE-DRYING PROCESS, AND USES FOR EFFLUENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alstat, Edward K. 15840 S.E. Ten Eyeck Road Sandy OR 97055 / US | [2006/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/40] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2012/49] | Wörz, Volker Alfred Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2006/40] | Wörz, Volker Alfred Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 04813265.8 | 06.12.2004 | [2006/40] | WO2004US40924 | Priority number, date | US20030746475 | 24.12.2003 Original published format: US 746475 | [2006/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005066561 | Date: | 21.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1706693 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1706693 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.07.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F26B5/06, F26B5/04, F26B13/30, F25C1/00, B01B1/00 | [2006/40] | CPC: |
F26B5/06 (EP,US);
C02F1/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR RÜCKGEWINNUNG VON ABFLÜSSEN AUS EINEM GEFRIERTROCKNUNGSPROZESS UND VERWENDUNGEN FÜR DIE ABFLÜSSE | [2006/40] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RECLAIMING EFFLUENT FROM A FREEZE-DRYING PROCESS, AND USES FOR EFFLUENT | [2006/40] | French: | METHODE ET APPAREIL DE RECUPERATION DES EFFLUENTS D'UN PROCESSUS DE LYOPHILISATION, ET UTILISATIONS DES EFFLUENTS | [2006/40] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2006 | Search fee paid | 19.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/40] | 13.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2010 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   17.03.2011 | 31.12.2011 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   19.01.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.12.2004 | AT | 05.12.2012 | BE | 05.12.2012 | CY | 05.12.2012 | CZ | 05.12.2012 | EE | 05.12.2012 | FI | 05.12.2012 | IT | 05.12.2012 | LT | 05.12.2012 | NL | 05.12.2012 | PL | 05.12.2012 | RO | 05.12.2012 | SE | 05.12.2012 | SI | 05.12.2012 | SK | 05.12.2012 | TR | 05.12.2012 | IE | 06.12.2012 | LU | 06.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | BG | 05.03.2013 | GR | 06.03.2013 | IS | 05.04.2013 | PT | 05.04.2013 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
TR | 05.12.2012 | ||
IE | 06.12.2012 | ||
LU | 06.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
TR | 05.12.2012 | ||
IE | 06.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
IE | 06.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
IE | 06.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
IE | 06.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
IE | 06.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 05.12.2012 | |
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 05.12.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1054172 (LEYBOLD-HOCHVAKUUM-ANLAGEN G.M.B.H.) [Y] 9,11,19 * page 1, line 87 - page 2, line 2; figure . *; | [A]GB586693 (NAT RES CORP); | [XY]US3431655 (GROVER KENNETH M, et al) [X] 1-5,21 * the whole document * [Y] 9,11,19; | [A]GB1186477 (NESTLE SA) [A] 1,2,10,12,13,20 * the whole document *; | [A]US3769717 (CARLSEN C, et al) [A] 8,18 * column 4, lines 31-52; figure 3 *; | [X]DE2510758 (RAUTENBACH ROBERT) [X] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [XY]DE2522840 (SUWELACK NACHF DR OTTO) [X] 1,3,8,12,14,18,21 * the whole document * [Y] 5,13,15,16; | [XY]US4081914 (RAUTENBACH ROBERT, et al) [X] 1-4,21 * the whole document * [Y] 13,15; | [A]FR2461213 (KYOWA VACUUM ENG [JP]); | [YA]EP0546932 (BEUREL GUY [FR], et al) [Y] 5,16 * the whole document * [A] 1,3,12,14; | [A]EP0546597 (CRIOFARMA DI GIORGIO BRUTTINI [IT]) | International search | [Y]US3531871 (SAHARA YUKIO); | [Y]US3620776 (MISHKIN ABRAHAM RUDOLPH, et al); | [Y]US3936952 (SCHIMPFLE JORG); | [X]US4194924 (BURNETT CRAIG R [US], et al); | [X]US4749394 (EHRSAM CHRISTIAN [CH]); | [X]US5230162 (OYLER JR JAMES R [US]); | [Y]US6220048 (FINAN SR DONALD STUART [US], et al) |