EP1698062 - A COMMUNICATION DEVICE WITH ROTATING HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2014 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2014/24] |
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELL, Gary 13224 Gabilan Road San Diego, CA 92128 / US | 02 /
PETERSEN, Soren Almsvej 6 DK-4140 Borup / DK | [2006/36] | Representative(s) | Higgin, Paul, et al Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | Higgin, Paul, et al Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | ||
Former [2009/48] | Higgin, Paul, et al Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | ||
Former [2009/35] | Higgin, Paul, et al Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | ||
Former [2009/31] | Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2006/36] | Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka, et al Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 04813680.8 | 09.12.2004 | [2006/36] | WO2004US41390 | Priority number, date | US20030746054 | 23.12.2003 Original published format: US 746054 | [2006/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005065145 | Date: | 21.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1698062 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1698062 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.04.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/02, H04B1/38 | [2009/05] | CPC: |
H04M1/0225 (EP,US);
H04B1/38 (KR);
H04M1/0245 (EP,US);
H04M1/0227 (EP,US);
H04M1/0233 (EP,US);
H04M1/03 (EP,US);
H04M2250/52 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/36] | H04B1/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/36] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSEINRICHTUNG MIT ROTIERENDEM GEHÄUSE | [2006/36] | English: | A COMMUNICATION DEVICE WITH ROTATING HOUSING | [2006/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION POURVU D'UN BOITIER ROTATIF | [2013/13] |
Former [2006/36] | DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION POURVU D'UN BO TIER ROTATIF | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 12.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 19.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 08.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.12.2004 | AT | 07.08.2013 | BE | 07.08.2013 | BG | 07.08.2013 | CY | 07.08.2013 | CZ | 07.08.2013 | DK | 07.08.2013 | EE | 07.08.2013 | ES | 07.08.2013 | FI | 07.08.2013 | IT | 07.08.2013 | LT | 07.08.2013 | MC | 07.08.2013 | NL | 07.08.2013 | PL | 07.08.2013 | RO | 07.08.2013 | SE | 07.08.2013 | SI | 07.08.2013 | SK | 07.08.2013 | TR | 07.08.2013 | GR | 08.11.2013 | IS | 07.12.2013 | GB | 09.12.2013 | IE | 09.12.2013 | LU | 09.12.2013 | PT | 09.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | FR | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
TR | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
GB | 09.12.2013 | ||
IE | 09.12.2013 | ||
LU | 09.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
GB | 09.12.2013 | ||
IE | 09.12.2013 | ||
LU | 09.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
IE | 09.12.2013 | ||
LU | 09.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
LU | 09.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
LU | 09.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 07.08.2013 | ||
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 07.08.2013 | |
PT | 09.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2338141 (ORANGE PERSONAL COMM SERV LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-29 * page 17, line 2 - page 23, line 19; figures 4-7 *; | [Y]US6466202 (SUSO KOJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-29 * abstract * * column 4, line 3 - column 5, line 9 *; | [X]EP1271897 (PIONEER CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,6-15,17-29 * abstract * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0058] *; | [A]EP1298890 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-29* the whole document *; | [PX]US2004132512 (YAJIMA TAKAYUKI [JP]) [PX] 1,5,7-16,18-29 * abstract * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0050]; figures 1,2 * | International search | [Y]US6466202 (SUSO KOJI [JP], et al); | [YP]US6812954 (PRIESTMAN PAUL [GB], et al) | by applicant | GB2338141 | EP1271897 | EP1298890 |