EP1709479 - METHOD FOR MAKING MICRO-LENS ARRAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tang, Yin S. 201 Rockview Irvine CA 92612 / US | [2006/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/41] | Representative(s) | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol, et al WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol, et al W.P.Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2006/41] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04814003.2 | 10.12.2004 | [2006/41] | WO2004US41764 | Priority number, date | US20040754365 | 08.01.2004 Original published format: US 754365 | [2006/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005069782 | Date: | 04.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1709479 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.09.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/10 | [2006/41] | CPC: |
G02B6/2552 (EP,KR,US);
G02B27/1073 (KR);
B29C67/0044 (EP,US);
B29D11/00663 (EP,KR,US);
C03B37/028 (KR);
B29L2011/0075 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2007/15] |
Former [2006/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MIKROLINSEN-ARRAYS | [2006/41] | English: | METHOD FOR MAKING MICRO-LENS ARRAY | [2006/41] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE MATRICE DE MINI-LENTILLES | [2006/41] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2006 | Search fee paid | 20.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/41] | 27.07.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3961931 (NAKAGAWA KENJI, et al) [Y] 10,11,19 * abstract * * column 1, line 15 - line 20 * * column 6, line 49 - column 7, line 33 *; | [Y]EP0627641 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 20 * abstract * * column 8, line 28 - column 9, line 7 *; | [A]US5595669 (LE BRIS JEAN [FR]) [A] 1-20 * abstract ** column 2, line 25 - line 54 *; | [XY]US5996376 (JOHNSON ERIC G [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * abstract * * column 2, line 30 - line 64 * * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 36 * * column 6, line 65 - column 7, line 40 * * column 9, line 10 - line 42 * * the whole document * [Y] 10,11,19,20 | International search | [X]US3216807 (WOODCOCK RICHARD F) |