EP1697849 - TWO-WIRE INTERFACE HAVING DYNAMICALLY ADJUSTABLE DATA FIELDS DEPENDING ON OPERATION CODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.05.2009 [2009/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Finisar Corporation 1389 Moffett Park Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states FINISAR CORPORATION 1389 Moffett Park Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAHIN, Jayne, C. 11073 Firethorne Drive Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 02 /
DYBSETTER, Gerald, L. 180 Silverwood Drive Scotts Valley, CA 95066 / US | [2006/36] | Representative(s) | Margotti, Herwig Franz, et al Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 30 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Margotti, Herwig Franz, et al Kopecky & Schwarz Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 30 1010 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2006/36] | Margotti, Herwig Franz, et al Wipplinger Strasse 32/22 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 04814057.8 | 14.12.2004 | [2006/36] | WO2004US41823 | Priority number, date | US20030530067P | 15.12.2003 Original published format: US 530067 P | US20040814024 | 31.03.2004 Original published format: US 814024 | [2006/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005059763 | Date: | 30.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1697849 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/00, G06F15/16 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
G06F13/4291 (EP,US);
G06F13/14 (KR);
G06F13/00 (KR);
G06F15/16 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZWEIDRAHT-SCHNITTSTELLE MIT DYNAMISCH EINSTALLBAREN DATENFELDERN ABHÄNGIG VOM OPERATIONSCODE | [2006/36] | English: | TWO-WIRE INTERFACE HAVING DYNAMICALLY ADJUSTABLE DATA FIELDS DEPENDING ON OPERATION CODE | [2006/36] | French: | INTERFACE DEUX FILS A ZONES DE DONNEES DYNAMIQUEMENT ADAPTABLES SELON DES CODES DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2006/36] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 16.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 09.04.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0179962 (STRATUS TECHNOLOGIES INTERNATI [CH], et al) [A] * page 8, line 22 - page 12, line 25 *; | [A]US2003140187 (MORIWAKI SHOHEI [JP], et al) [A] 1-32 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0008] *; | [A]US2003200374 (MORIWAKI SHOHEI [JP], et al) [A] 1-32 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0012] *; | [X] - BUDHADHATTI R, "USE THE MDIO BUS TO INTERROGATE COMPLEX DEVICES TWO-PIN BUS SPECIFIED IN IEEE RFC802.3 LETS DESIGNERS COMMUNICATE WITH SWITCHES AND ROUTERS", ELECTRONIC DESIGN, PENTON MEDIA, CLEVELAND, OH, US, (20011203), vol. 49, no. 25, ISSN 0013-4872, pages 59 - 60,62, XP001168375 [X] 1-32 * figure 4 * * the whole document * | International search | [XP]US2004153786 (JOHNSON KARL S [US], et al); | [AP]US2004221085 (BEE GRAHAM MICHAEL [GB], et al); | [AP]US2004122490 (REINKE JAMES D [US], et al) |