EP1703947 - TELEMETRY SYSTEM AND METHOD WITH VARIABLE PARAMETERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic MiniMed, Inc. 18000 Devonshire Street Northridge, CA 91325 / US | [2006/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORGAN, Wayne, A. 17524 Prairie Street Northridge, California 91325 / US | 02 /
HESS, Philip B. 3927 Paige Street Los Angeles, California 90031 / US | [2006/39] | Representative(s) | Ruschke, Hans Edvard Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/39] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04814085.9 | 15.12.2004 | [2006/39] | WO2004US41857 | Priority number, date | US20030746004 | 26.12.2003 Original published format: US 746004 | [2006/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005065773 | Date: | 21.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1703947 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1703947 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/372, G08C17/04, H04B1/04 | [2006/39] | CPC: |
A61N1/37223 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TELEMETRIESYSTEM UND VERFAHREN MIT VARIABLEN PARAMETERN | [2006/39] | English: | TELEMETRY SYSTEM AND METHOD WITH VARIABLE PARAMETERS | [2006/39] | French: | SYSTEME DE TELEMETRIE ET PROCEDE A PARAMETRES VARIABLES | [2006/39] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/39] | 28.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.07.2008 | BE | 09.07.2008 | CY | 09.07.2008 | CZ | 09.07.2008 | DK | 09.07.2008 | EE | 09.07.2008 | FI | 09.07.2008 | IT | 09.07.2008 | LT | 09.07.2008 | NL | 09.07.2008 | PL | 09.07.2008 | RO | 09.07.2008 | SI | 09.07.2008 | SK | 09.07.2008 | TR | 09.07.2008 | BG | 09.10.2008 | SE | 09.10.2008 | GR | 10.10.2008 | ES | 20.10.2008 | IS | 09.11.2008 | PT | 09.12.2008 | IE | 15.12.2008 | LU | 15.12.2008 | CH | 31.12.2008 | LI | 31.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | HU | 10.01.2009 | [2010/51] |
Former [2010/38] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CY | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IT | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
PL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
TR | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
IE | 15.12.2008 | ||
LU | 15.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
HU | 10.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CY | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IT | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
PL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
IE | 15.12.2008 | ||
LU | 15.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
HU | 10.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IT | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
PL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
IE | 15.12.2008 | ||
LU | 15.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IT | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
PL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
IE | 15.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IT | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
IE | 15.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IT | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
IE | 15.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IT | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 09.07.2008 | |
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | LT | 09.07.2008 | |
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4561443 (HOGREFE ARTHUR F [US], et al) [A] 1-57 * column 5, line 25 - column 30, line 46 *; | [A]US5264843 (SILVIAN SERGIU [US]) [A] 1-57 * column 3, line 22 - column 9, line 46 *; | [A]WO9424772 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-57* page 4, line 18 - page 8, line 37 *; | [A]US5630836 (PREM EDWARD K [US], et al) [A] 1-57 * column 1, line 49 - column 15, line 35 *; | [A]US6301504 (SILVIAN SERGIU [US]) [A] 1-57 * column 4, line 6 - column 13, line 42 * |