EP1696819 - DRIVE SYSTEM FOR ELECTRIC TOOTHBRUSHES AND THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York NY 10022-7499 / US | ||
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FATTORI, Joseph 27 Phoenix Drive Mendham, New Jersey 07945 / US | [2006/36] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 04814112.1 | 13.12.2004 | [2006/36] | WO2004US41888 | Priority number, date | US20030735970 | 15.12.2003 Original published format: US 735970 | [2006/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005058191 | Date: | 30.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1696819 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1696819 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61C17/34, B26B19/28, A61H23/02 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
A61C17/349 (EP,US);
A61C17/16 (KR);
A61C17/34 (KR);
B26B19/28 (EP,US);
A61C17/3436 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/36] | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSSYSTEM FÜR ELEKTRISCHE ZAHNBÜRSTEN UND DERGLEICHEN | [2006/36] | English: | DRIVE SYSTEM FOR ELECTRIC TOOTHBRUSHES AND THE LIKE | [2006/36] | French: | SYSTEME D'ENTRAINEMENT POUR BROSSES A DENTS ELECTRIQUES ET ANALOGUES | [2006/36] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 23.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.01.2012 | CY | 18.01.2012 | CZ | 18.01.2012 | DK | 18.01.2012 | EE | 18.01.2012 | FI | 18.01.2012 | LT | 18.01.2012 | PL | 18.01.2012 | RO | 18.01.2012 | SE | 18.01.2012 | SI | 18.01.2012 | SK | 18.01.2012 | BG | 18.04.2012 | GR | 19.04.2012 | IS | 18.05.2012 | PT | 18.05.2012 | [2013/07] |
Former [2012/50] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 18.01.2012 | |
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 18.01.2012 | |
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 18.01.2012 | |
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 18.01.2012 | |
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 18.01.2012 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3029651 (FLATT HAROLD R) [Y] 1-18 * column 2, lines 36-57 * * figures 1-5 *; | [DA]US4149291 (STOLTZ WERNER) [DA] 1,11,12 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 21 ** figure - *; | [A]DE19802904 (FINALPINA AG [CH]) [A] 1,2,7,12-14 * figure - *; | [Y]DE10106610 (HOFMANN JOERG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-18 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [DA]WO03024353 (BRAUN GMBH [DE], et al) [DA] 1,10-12 * page 10, paragraphs 5,6 * * page 12, paragraphs 2,3 * * figures 2-7 * | by applicant | US4149291 | US5625914 | WO03002453 | WO03024353 |