EP1702031 - SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND CATALYSTS FOR PRODUCING A CRUDE PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2009 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/38] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONAL RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHAN, Opinder, Kishan 714 Cranfield Court Katy, TX 77450 / US | 02 /
WELLINGTON, Scott, Lee 5109 Aspen Street Bellaire, TX 77401 / US | [2006/38] | Representative(s) | Zeestraten, Albertus W. J. Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/38] | Zeestraten, Albertus W. J. Shell International B.V., Intellectual Property Services, P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 04814324.2 | 16.12.2004 | [2006/38] | WO2004US42125 | Priority number, date | US20030531506P | 19.12.2003 Original published format: US 531506 P | US20040618892P | 14.10.2004 Original published format: US 618892 P | [2006/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005065189 | Date: | 21.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1702031 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C10G29/04 | [2006/38] | CPC: |
C10G45/00 (EP,KR);
B01J23/22 (EP);
B01J23/28 (EP);
B01J35/60 (EP,KR);
C10G29/04 (KR);
C10G45/04 (EP);
C10L1/04 (KR);
B01J35/647 (EP);
B01J35/66 (EP);
B01J37/0009 (EP);
B01J37/0203 (EP);
C10G2300/203 (EP);
C10G2300/205 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME, VERFAHREN UND KATALYSATOREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ROHPRODUKTS | [2006/38] | English: | SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND CATALYSTS FOR PRODUCING A CRUDE PRODUCT | [2006/38] | French: | SYSTEMES, PROCEDES ET CATALYSEURS DESTINES A LA PRODUCTION D'UN PRODUIT BRUT | [2006/38] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 02.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/53] | 07.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/53] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 31.10.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 31.10.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.11.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US3766054 (WEISZ P, et al) [X] 14-17 * the whole document *[A] 1-13; | [X]GB1364238 (TOPSOE H F A) [X] 1-5,7-17 * page 1, line 8 - line 47 * * page 4, line 63 - line 71 * * page 5, line 33 - line 37; claim 1 *; | [XA]US4411824 (CHEN H CHIU [US]) [X] 14-17 * column 2, line 20 - line 51 * * column 4, line 11 - line 25 * [A] 1-13; | [X]EP0225686 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [X] 1-17 * page 1, line 2 - line 4 * * page 6, line 1 - line 24; claims 1,5; tables 2,5 *; | [XA]US4830736 (HUNG CHI-WEN [US], et al) [X] 14-17 * the whole document * [A] 1-13; | [XA]US6309537 (HARLE VIRGINIE [FR], et al) [X] 14-17 * the whole document * [A] 1-13 | by applicant | US4411824 | EP0225686 | US5468372 | US5688736 | US5851381 | US5871636 | US5897769 | US5914030 | US5928502 | US6063266 | US6277269 | US6290841 | US6547957 | US2003111391 | - J. J. HEITHAUS, "Measurement and Significance of Asphaltene Peptization", JOURNAL OF INSTITUTE OF PETROLEUM, (196202), vol. 48, no. 458, pages 45 - 53 |