EP1702047 - SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND CATALYSTS FOR PRODUCING A CRUDE PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.05.2016 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Oil Company One Shell Plaza, P.O. Box 2463 Houston, Texas 77252-2463 / US | [2006/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHAN, Opinder, Kishan 714 Cranfield Court Katy, TX 77450 / US | 02 /
WELLINGTON, Scott, Lee 5109 Aspen Street Bellaire, Texas 77401 / US | [2006/38] | Representative(s) | Matthezing, Robert Maarten, et al Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/23] | Matthezing, Robert Maarten, et al Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2006/38] | Zeestraten, Albertus W. J., et al Shell International B.V., Intellectual Property Services, P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 04814585.8 | 16.12.2004 | [2006/38] | WO2004US42426 | Priority number, date | US20030531506P | 19.12.2003 Original published format: US 531506 P | US20040618892P | 14.10.2004 Original published format: US 618892 P | [2006/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005061669 | Date: | 07.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1702047 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C10G47/00 | [2006/38] | CPC: |
C10G45/00 (EP,KR);
B01J23/22 (EP);
B01J23/28 (EP);
B01J35/60 (EP,KR);
C10G29/04 (KR);
C10G45/04 (EP);
C10L1/04 (KR);
B01J35/647 (EP);
B01J35/66 (EP);
B01J37/0009 (EP);
B01J37/0203 (EP);
C10G2300/203 (EP);
C10G2300/205 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME, VERFAHREN UND KATALYSATOREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ROHPRODUKTS | [2006/38] | English: | SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND CATALYSTS FOR PRODUCING A CRUDE PRODUCT | [2006/38] | French: | SYSTEMES, PROCEDES, ET CATALYSEURS POUR LA PRODUCTION D'UN PRODUIT BRUT | [2006/38] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 28.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.11.2016 | 02.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/25] | 12.02.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/25] | 08.11.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.12.2007 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.10.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB934907 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO) [X] 1-21 * page 5, line 2 - line 10; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]GB1232173 (SHELL) [X] 1-21 * page 1, line 14 - line 31 * * page 2, line 72 - line 120; claim 1 *; | [X]US3712861 (ROSINSKI E, et al) [X] 1-21 * column 1, line 41 - line 70 * * column 3, line 44 - line 62; claim 1 *; | [X]US4447314 (BANTA FREDERICK [US]) [X] 1-21 * column 2, line 14 - line 21 * * column 7, line 43 - line 44; claim 1 *; | [X]US4613425 (HIGASHI HIDEHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-21* column 1, line 4 - line 18; claim 1 *; | [X]US4992157 (BRICKER JEFFERY C [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * column 5, line 43 - line 48; claim 1 *; | [DX]US6063266 (GRANDE KNUT [NO], et al) [DX] 1-21 * example 1; claims 1,16 *; | [X]US6436280 (HARLE VIRGINIE [FR], et al) [X] 1-21 * column 1, line 5 - line 30; example 10 *; | [X]WO03091363 (BP OIL INT [GB], et al) [X] 1-21 * page 2, line 6 - line 11; figure 1; claim 1 * | by applicant | GB934907 | US4447314 | US4613425 | US5468372 | US5688736 | US5744025 | US5851381 | US5897769 | US5928502 | US6063266 | US6218333 | US6277269 | US6290841 | US6436280 | US6547957 | US2003111391 | WO03091363 | - J. J. HEITHAUS, "Measurement and Significance of Asphaltene Peptization", JOURNAL OF INSTITUTE OF PETROLEUM, (196202), vol. 48, no. 458, pages 45 - 53 |