EP1701696 - ANHYDROUS SKIN CLEANSING AND SCRUBBING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York NY 10022-7499 / US | ||
Former [2006/38] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10022-7499 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOLIMAN, Nadia 53 Racetrack Road East Brunswick, NJ 08816 / US | 02 /
GHAIM, Josh 89 Rachel Court Franklin Park, NJ 08823 / US | [2006/38] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/38] | Jenkins, Peter David PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 04814996.7 | 17.12.2004 | [2006/38] | WO2004US42867 | Priority number, date | US20030531559P | 19.12.2003 Original published format: US 531559 P | [2006/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005063198 | Date: | 14.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1701696 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/92, A61K8/37, A61K8/34, A61K8/60, A61K8/36, A61K8/41, A61Q19/10 | [2006/38] | CPC: |
A61Q19/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/92 (KR);
A61K8/25 (EP,US);
A61K8/60 (EP,US);
A61K8/922 (EP,US);
A61K2800/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASSERFREIE HAUTREINIGUNGS- UND SCHEUERZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2006/38] | English: | ANHYDROUS SKIN CLEANSING AND SCRUBBING COMPOSITION | [2006/38] | French: | COMPOSITION ANHYDRE DE NETTOYAGE ET DE PURIFICATION DE LA PEAU | [2006/38] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 27.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/52] | 06.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US4673526 (ZABOTTO ARLETTE [FR], et al) [AD] 1-4 * claims 1,3,9 ** column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 57 *; | [Y]US6217889 (LORENZI MARC PAUL [GB], et al) [Y] 9 * column 37, line 4 - column 38, line 22; claim 1 *; | [A]WO0185103 (LADEN KARL [IL], et al) [A] 1-9 * claims 1,2,4,5,8,10,22 * * examples 1-10 * * page 1, line 14 - line 19 * * page 2, line 17 - line 20 * * page 3, line 7 - line 16 * * page 7, line 24 - page 8, line 15 *; | [AD]US6524594 (SANTORA DELORES M [US], et al) [AD] 1-9 * claims 1-4,9,10,13,15,16,25 * * examples 7-21,25 * * column 2, line 16 - line 21 * * column 2, line 49 - line 52 *; | [XY]US2003133900 (MCLAUGHLIN JAMES HUGH [US]) [X] 1-8 * claims 1-34 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] - [0010] - [0014] - [0019] - [0025] - [0031] * [Y] 9 |