EP1697076 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FRACTURING SEAL RINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EDWARDS, Mark, Stephen 26 Tall Oaks Drive Hockessin, Delaware 19707 / US | [2006/36] | Representative(s) | Heinemann, Monica Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | Heinemann, Monica Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/36] | Heinemann, Monica Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte Poschingerstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04815102.1 | 21.12.2004 | [2006/36] | WO2004US42985 | Priority number, date | US20030531711P | 22.12.2003 Original published format: US 531711 P | US20040014008 | 16.12.2004 Original published format: US 14008 | [2012/01] |
Former [2006/36] | US20030531711P | 22.12.2003 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005063428 | Date: | 14.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1697076 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1697076 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B23D31/00 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
B23D31/003 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T225/10 (EP,US);
Y10T225/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ZERBRECHEN VON DICHTUNGSRINGEN | [2006/36] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FRACTURING SEAL RINGS | [2006/36] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE ROMPRE DES BAGUES D'ETANCHEITE | [2006/36] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 24.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2004 | CY | 13.06.2012 | CZ | 13.06.2012 | DK | 13.06.2012 | EE | 13.06.2012 | FI | 13.06.2012 | LT | 13.06.2012 | NL | 13.06.2012 | PL | 13.06.2012 | RO | 13.06.2012 | SE | 13.06.2012 | SI | 13.06.2012 | SK | 13.06.2012 | TR | 13.06.2012 | BG | 13.09.2012 | GR | 14.09.2012 | IS | 13.10.2012 | PT | 15.10.2012 | AT | 21.12.2012 | IE | 21.12.2012 | IT | 21.12.2012 | LU | 21.12.2012 | ES | 22.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
TR | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
AT | 21.12.2012 | ||
IE | 21.12.2012 | ||
IT | 21.12.2012 | ||
LU | 21.12.2012 | ||
ES | 22.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
TR | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
AT | 21.12.2012 | ||
IE | 21.12.2012 | ||
IT | 21.12.2012 | ||
ES | 22.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
TR | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
IE | 21.12.2012 | ||
IT | 21.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
IE | 21.12.2012 | ||
IT | 21.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
IE | 21.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
IE | 21.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 13.06.2012 | |
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 13.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE3120655 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER KG [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,6-13,15,16 * the whole document * [Y] 2,5,14; | [Y]CH345206 (RICEFIELD LOUIS [US]) [Y] 2,5,14 * figure 4 *; | [A]GB2145947 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER KG); | [A]US4821386 (SIMON MICHAEL [DE], et al); | [DA]US5988649 (VAN RYPER RICHARD GERARD [US], et al) |