EP1697114 - METHODS OF MAKING A PATTERN OF OPTICAL ELEMENT SHAPES ON A ROLL FOR USE IN MAKING OPTICAL ELEMENTS ON OR IN SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2011 [2011/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rambus International Ltd Codan Trust Company (Cayman) Limited Cricket Square Hutchins Drive PO Box 2681 Grand Cayman KY-1111 / KY | [2010/27] |
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states Solid State Opto Limited P.O. Box 957, Offshore Incorporations Centre, Road Town Tortola Virgin Islands British / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARKER, Jeffery, R. 3050 Whitetail Ct. Richfield, OH 44286 / US | 02 /
McCOLLUM, Timothy A. 616 Wedgewood Drive Avon Lake, OH 44012 / US | 03 /
STARKEY, Kurt, R. 14381 Savannah Court Strongsville, OH 44136 / US | [2006/46] |
Former [2006/36] | 01 /
PARKER, Jeffery, R. 3050 Whitetail Ct. Richfield, OH 44286 / US | ||
02 /
MC COLLUM, Timothy, A. 27565 Remmington Circle Weslake, OH 44145 / US | |||
03 /
STARKEY, Kurt, R. 14381 Savannah Court Strongsville, OH 44136 / US | Representative(s) | Cawley, Aimee Elizabeth, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/20] | Cawley, Aimee Elizabeth, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | ||
Former [2006/36] | Regan-Addis, Heather, et al Lloyd Wise, McNeight & Lawrence Commonwealth House 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 04815308.4 | 21.12.2004 | [2006/36] | WO2004US43211 | Priority number, date | US20030744276 | 23.12.2003 Original published format: US 744276 | [2006/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005062908 | Date: | 14.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1697114 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.03.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B29D11/00, B29C43/22 | [2010/19] | CPC: |
G02B6/0065 (EP,US);
G02B6/13 (KR);
B29D11/00288 (EP,US);
F21V5/00 (EP,US);
G02B6/0018 (EP,US);
G02B6/0021 (EP,US);
G02B6/0036 (EP,US);
G02B6/0038 (EP,US);
G02B6/0068 (EP,US);
A61B2090/309 (EP,US);
G02B3/0006 (EP,US);
G02B5/045 (EP,US);
G02B6/0028 (EP,US);
G02B6/0031 (EP,US);
G02B6/0043 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/36] | B29D11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MUSTERS VON OPTISCHEN ELEMENTFORMEN AUF EINER WALZE ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER HERSTELLUNG VON OPTISCHEN ELEMENTEN AUF ODER IN SUBSTRATEN | [2006/36] | English: | METHODS OF MAKING A PATTERN OF OPTICAL ELEMENT SHAPES ON A ROLL FOR USE IN MAKING OPTICAL ELEMENTS ON OR IN SUBSTRATES | [2006/36] | French: | PROCEDES DE CREATION D'UN MODELE DE FORMES D'ELEMENTS OPTIQUES SUR UN ROULEAU DESTINE A ETRE UTILISE POUR FORMER DES ELEMENTS OPTIQUES SUR OU DANS DES SUBSTRATS | [2006/36] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 26.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 24.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/09] | 06.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5762736 (HERBERT WILLIAM G [US], et al) [Y] 5* column 4, line 3 - line 29 *; | [XY]WO9912718 (MIKKELSEN OEYSTEIN [US]) [X] 1-4,6,7 * page 5, line 12 - page 9, line 36 * * page 18, line 1 - page 19, line 33 * * page 21, line 10 - page 23, line 8; figures 8-10 * [Y] 5 | International search | [X]US5330799 (SANDOR ELLEN R [US], et al) |