EP1699792 - PIPERAZINE, [1,4]DIAZEPANE, [1,4]DIAZOCANE, AND [1,5]DIAZOCANE FUSED IMIDAZO RING COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/37] | PIPERAZINE, 1,4 ̈DIAZEPANE, 1,4 ̈DIAZOCANE, AND 1,5 ̈DIAZOCANE FUSED IMIDAZO RING COMPOUNDS | ||
[2006/47] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.09.2007 [2007/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KSHIRSAGAR, Tushar A. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
GRIESGRABER, George W. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
Celebi, Azim.A. 2015 Galloping Hill Road K-15-1-1800 Kenilworth, NJ 07033 / US | 04 /
HEPPNER, Philip D. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2006/37] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04815538.6 | 22.12.2004 | [2006/37] | WO2004US43474 | Priority number, date | US20030533024P | 29.12.2003 Original published format: US 533024 P | [2006/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005066172 | Date: | 21.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1699792 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/14, C07D471/22, A61K31/551, A61P31/12, A61P35/00 | [2006/37] | CPC: |
C07D471/14 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D471/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/37] | Extension states | AL | 12.07.2006 | BA | 12.07.2006 | HR | 12.07.2006 | LV | Not yet paid | MK | 12.07.2006 | YU | 12.07.2006 | Title | German: | PIPERAZIN-, [1,4]DIAZEPAN-, [1,4]DIAZOCAN- UND [1,5]DIAZOCAN-KONDENSIERTE IMIDAZORINGVERBINDUNGEN | [2006/37] | English: | PIPERAZINE, [1,4]DIAZEPANE, [1,4]DIAZOCANE, AND [1,5]DIAZOCANE FUSED IMIDAZO RING COMPOUNDS | [2006/47] | French: | COMPOSES DE CYCLES ACCOLES IMIDAZO DE PIPERAZINE, [1,4]DIAZEPANE, [1,4]DIAZOCANE, ET [1,5]DIAZOCANE | [2006/47] |
Former [2006/37] | PIPERAZINE, 1,4 ̈DIAZEPANE, 1,4 ̈DIAZOCANE, AND 1,5 ̈DIAZOCANE FUSED IMIDAZO RING COMPOUNDS | ||
Former [2006/37] | COMPOSES DE CYCLES ACCOLES IMIDAZO DE PIPERAZINE, 1,4 ̈DIAZEPANE, 1,4 ̈DIAZOCANE, ET 1,5 ̈DIAZOCANE | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/37] | 06.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/37] | 25.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9621663 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-27 * Formula II,; page 13, lines 17-22; example 3; claims 1,8 *; | [A]WO0246194 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * Formula I,; page 25, lines 1-14 *; | [A]US6541485 (CROOKS STEPHEN L [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * Formula I,; column 14, line 38 - column 16, line 32 *; | [A]WO9502597 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-27 * Formula I,; page 13, lines 5-20 *; | [A]WO9918105 (ORTHO MCNEIL PHARM INC [US]) [A] 1-27 * Formula I,; page 3, lines 26-35 * |