EP1699504 - TRANSCUTANEOUS IMPLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cyberkinetics, Inc. 100 Foxborough Blvd., Suite 240 Foxborough, MA 02035 / US | [2006/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLAHERTY, J., Christopher 242 Ipswich Road Topsfield, MA 01983 / US | 02 /
GUILLORY, Shane, K. 1941 East Romana Avenue Salt Lake City, UT / US | 03 /
SERRUYA, Mijail, D. 31 Doane Avenue Providence, RI 02906 / US | 04 /
CAPLAN, Abraham, H. 34 Gorham Street Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | [2006/37] | Representative(s) | Molnia, David Df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | Molnia, David Dörries Frank-Molnia Pohlman, Triftstrasse 13 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04815648.3 | 28.12.2004 | [2006/37] | WO2004US43624 | Priority number, date | US20030532984P | 29.12.2003 Original published format: US 532984 P | US20040014907 | 20.12.2004 Original published format: US 14907 | [2006/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005065738 | Date: | 21.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1699504 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/00, A61B5/04, A61N1/36 | [2006/37] | CPC: |
A61N1/0529 (EP,US);
A61B5/24 (EP);
A61B5/388 (US);
A61B5/4041 (EP,US);
A61B5/6864 (EP,US);
A61M39/0247 (EP,US);
A61N1/0531 (EP,US);
A61N1/0539 (EP,US);
A61M2039/025 (EP,US);
A61M2039/0267 (EP,US);
A61M2039/0288 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3569 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSKUTANES IMPLANTAT | [2006/37] | English: | TRANSCUTANEOUS IMPLANT | [2006/37] | French: | IMPLANT TRANSCUTANE | [2006/37] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/37] | 08.09.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/48] | 07.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5026397 (AOKI HIDEKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10,63-117 * column 4, lines 44-64; figure 1 ** column 6, lines 47-57 *; | [XI]US5782645 (STOBIE JOHN J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,93,97,101 * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 45; figures 1-3,14,15 * * column 7, lines 35,36 * * column 11, line 66 - column 12, line 5 * [I] 94; | [XYI]US5873368 (SABIN PIERRE [FR]) [X] 1,2,10,63,65-68,81-92,95,98,99,102-111,116,117 * the whole document * * In particular; column 3, lines 1-12; figures 1-3 * * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 21 * * column 7, lines 29-41; figures 8-10 * [Y] 3,5,6,64,69-80,112-115 [I] 7-9,96,100; | [A]US2002161403 (MEADOWS PAUL M [US], et al) [A] 9 * paragraphs [0083] , [0084] *; | [Y]US6503228 (LI JUN [US], et al) [Y] 3,5,6 * column 1, lines 40-48 * * In particular; column 1, lines 40-48 * * column 4, lines 10-27 * * column 4, lines 10-27 *; | [Y]WO03026739 (VERTIS NEUROSCIENCE INC [US], et al) [Y] 112-115 * paragraph [0112] *; | [Y]WO03101532 (CYBERKINETICS INC [US]) [Y] 64,69-80 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraphs [0034] , [0037] - [0041]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0054] * |