EP1697994 - TRANSISTOR GATE ELECTRODE HAVING CONDUCTOR MATERIAL LAYER AND METHOD OF FABRICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/36] | TRANSISTOR GATE ELECTRODE HAVING CONDUCTOR MATERIAL LAYER | ||
[2009/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURPHY, Anand 10934 NW Lucerne Court Portland, OR 97229 / US | 02 /
BOYANOV, Boyan 15760 NW Rondos Drive Portland, OR 97229 / US | 03 /
DATTA, Suman 16659 NW Talkingstick Way Beaverton, OR 97006 / US | 04 /
DOYLE, Brian, S. 11156 NW Montreux Lane Portland, OR 97224 / US | 05 /
JIN, Been-Yih 2922 NW Norwalk Place Beaverton, OR 97006 / US | 06 /
YU, Shaofeng 5720 Cedar Grove Circle Plano, TX 75093 / US | 07 /
CHAU, Robert 8875 SW 171st Avenue Beaverton, OR 97007 / US | [2006/36] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Goddar, Heinz J. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/36] | Goddar, Heinz J. Forrester & Boehmert Anwaltssozietät Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04815678.0 | 22.12.2004 | [2006/36] | WO2004US43663 | Priority number, date | US20030745978 | 24.12.2003 Original published format: US 745978 | [2006/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005067055 | Date: | 21.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1697994 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1697994 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/10, H01L29/49, H01L21/28, H01L21/8238, H01L21/8234 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
H01L29/1054 (EP,US);
H01L21/18 (KR);
H01L21/823807 (EP,US);
H01L21/823814 (EP,US);
H01L21/823842 (EP,US);
H01L21/823857 (EP,US);
H01L29/66636 (EP,US);
H01L29/7842 (EP,US);
H01L29/7848 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSISTOR-GATE-ELEKTRODE MIT LEITER-MATERIALSCHICHT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2009/23] | English: | TRANSISTOR GATE ELECTRODE HAVING CONDUCTOR MATERIAL LAYER AND METHOD OF FABRICATION | [2009/23] | French: | ELECTRODE DE GRILLE DE TRANSISTOR, COMPORTANT UNE COUCHE DE MATERIAU CONDUCTEUR ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2009/23] |
Former [2006/36] | TRANSISTOR-GATE-ELEKTRODE MIT LEITER-MATERIALSCHICHT | ||
Former [2006/36] | TRANSISTOR GATE ELECTRODE HAVING CONDUCTOR MATERIAL LAYER | ||
Former [2006/36] | ELECTRODE DE GRILLE DE TRANSISTOR, COMPORTANT UNE COUCHE DE MATERIAU CONDUCTEUR | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 28.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09012031.2 / EP2136404 | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.11.2009 | BE | 25.11.2009 | CY | 25.11.2009 | CZ | 25.11.2009 | DK | 25.11.2009 | EE | 25.11.2009 | FI | 25.11.2009 | IT | 25.11.2009 | LT | 25.11.2009 | NL | 25.11.2009 | PL | 25.11.2009 | RO | 25.11.2009 | SE | 25.11.2009 | SI | 25.11.2009 | SK | 25.11.2009 | TR | 25.11.2009 | IE | 22.12.2009 | LU | 22.12.2009 | CH | 31.12.2009 | LI | 31.12.2009 | FR | 25.01.2010 | BG | 25.02.2010 | GR | 26.02.2010 | ES | 08.03.2010 | IS | 25.03.2010 | PT | 25.03.2010 | HU | 26.05.2010 | MC | 01.07.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 22.12.2009 | ||
LU | 22.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
FR | 25.01.2010 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
HU | 26.05.2010 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 22.12.2009 | ||
LU | 22.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 22.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 22.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 22.12.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/31] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 25.11.2009 | |
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 25.11.2009 | |
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/21] | LT | 25.11.2009 | |
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6111267 (FISCHER HERMANN [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [Y]US2002105015 (KUBO MINORU [JP], et al) [Y] 5,14 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2003227013 (CURRIE MATTHEW T [US], et al) [A] 1* figure 8 *; | [XY] - WU D ET AL, "A NOVEL STRAINED SI0.7GE0.3 SURFACE-CHANNEL PMOSFET WITH AN ALD TIN/AL2O3/HFALOX/AL2O3 GATE STACK", IEEE ELECTRON DEVICE LETTERS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (200303), vol. 24, no. 3, ISSN 0741-3106, pages 171 - 173, XP001169959 [X] 1-4,7-15,22-24 * figure 1 * [Y] 5,14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LED.2003.809524 | [A] - RITENOUR A ET AL, "Epitaxial Strained Germanium p-MOSFETs with HfO2 Gate Dielectric and TaN Gate Electrode", INTERNATIONAL ELECTRON DEVICES MEETING 2003. IEDM. TECHNICAL DIGEST. WASHINGTON, DC, DEC 8 - 10, 2003, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20031208), ISBN 0-7803-7872-5, pages 433 - 436, XP010684045 [A] 1 * figure 1 * | Examination | WO0193338 |