EP1697300 - BONE TARGETING COMPOUNDS FOR DELIVERING AGENTS TO THE BONE FOR INTERACTION THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.2012 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.01.2013 [2013/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Louisville Research Foundation LL02 Jouet Hall, University of Louisville Louisville, KY 40292 / US | [2006/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIERCE, William, M., Jr. 4217 Briarwood Road Louisville, KY 40207 / US | 02 /
WAITE, Leonard, C. 122 Beechmont Drive N.E. Corydon, IN 47112 / US | 03 /
TAYLOR, K., Grant 1838 Yale Drive Louisville, KY 40205 / US | [2006/36] | Representative(s) | Davies, Gregory Mark, et al Murgitroyd & Company Cardiff Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Davies, Gregory Mark, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | ||
Former [2009/21] | Davies, Gregory Mark, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | ||
Former [2006/36] | Strachan, Victoria Jane, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Alexandra House, 1 Alexandra Road Swansea SA1 5ED / GB | Application number, filing date | 04815707.7 | 22.12.2004 | [2006/36] | WO2004US43693 | Priority number, date | US20030532342P | 24.12.2003 Original published format: US 532342 P | [2006/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005065315 | Date: | 21.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1697300 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.10.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07C229/00 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
C07C237/30 (EP,US);
A61P19/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUF KNOCHEN ZIELENDE VERBINDUNGEN ZUR VERABREICHUNG VON MITTELN AN DEN KNOCHEN ZUR WECHSELWIRKUNG DAMIT | [2006/36] | English: | BONE TARGETING COMPOUNDS FOR DELIVERING AGENTS TO THE BONE FOR INTERACTION THEREWITH | [2006/36] | French: | COMPOSES DE CIBLAGE DE TISSU OSSEUX PERMETTANT L'ADMINISTRATION A UN OS D'AGENTS CON US POUR INTERAGIR AVEC L'OS | [2006/36] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2006 | Search fee paid | 07.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 07.09.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/02] | 24.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0066613 (RES CORP TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 12-16 * page 148 - page 151; examples 1,2 *; | [X]WO02055518 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) [X] 12,13 *page 80; page 88 *; | JP2002322139 [ ] (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC); | [X] - CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUT ZUR FOERDERUNG DER CHEMISCHEN WISSENSCHAFTEN, FRANKFURT AM MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 3266485, XP002447166 [X] 12-15,18 * column A * | [X] - BRETSCHNEIDER, H. ET AL, "In 4 - Stellung substituierte Derivate der 1,3 - Dihydroxy - naphthoesäure - (2)", MONATSHEFTE FUER CHEMIE , 88, 652-62 CODEN: MOCMB7; ISSN: 0026-9247, (1957), XP008082575 [X] 12-14,17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00901350 | [X] - SEMENITZ, E. ET AL, "Antibacterial activity of some 4-substituted derivatives of 1,3-dihydroxy-2-naphthoic acid", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1961:132029, URL: STN, XP002146782 [X] 12-14,17 * abstract * | [X] - CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUT ZUR FOERDERUNG DER CHEMISCHEN WISSENSCHAFTEN, FRANKFURT AM MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 3269966, XP002447167 [X] 12-14 * column A * | [X] - NAGAI, NAOSHI ET AL, "Preparation of aminodihydroxybenzoic acids", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2002:847754, URL: STN, XP002447168 [X] 12-14 * abstract * | [X] - FIESER, LOUIS F. ET AL, "Naphthoquinone antimalarials. X. Miscellaneous compounds with oxygen, halogen, or nitrogen in the side chain", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1949:6414, URL: STN, XP002447169 [X] 12,14,17 * abstract * | [X] - BRAIN, E. G. ET AL, "Derivatives of 6-aminopenicillanic acid. IV. Analogs of 2,6-dimethoxyphenylpenicillin in the naphthalene and quinoline series", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1963:39996, URL: STN, XP002447170 [X] 12,13 * abstract * | [X] - BOBELDIJK, M. ET AL, "A simple and high-yield synthesis of (S)-BZM, (R)-BZM and (S)-IBZM for the preparation of (S)-123I-IBZM", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1991:121926, URL: STN, XP002447171 [X] 12,13 * abstract * | [X] - BRANCHINI, ROSANNA ET AL, "Some derivatives of p-orsellinic acid", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1959:44959, URL: STN, XP002447172 [X] 12,14 * abstract * | [ ] - CHEM. PHARM. BULL., (1958), vol. 6, pages 648 - 652 | International search | [X] - BARTON D. H.R. ET AL, "Synthesis of tetrascycline. VI. Oxidation and reduction of potential ring A precursors.", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY., (197112), vol. 12, pages 2204 - 2215, XP002146780 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/j39710002204 |