EP1711445 - FUSION - CAST ZIRCONIA REFRACTORY WITH HIGH ELECTRICAL RESISTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/42] | FUSION-CAST REFRACTORY WITH HIGH ELECTRICAL RESISTIVITY | ||
[2011/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2012 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Refractory Intellectual Property GmbH & Co. KG Wienerbergstraße 11 1100 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states Refractory Intellectual Property GmbH & Co. KG Wienerbergstrasse 11 1100 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2006/43] | For all designated states Monofrax, Inc. 1870 New York Avenue Falconer, NY 14733 / US | ||
Former [2006/42] | For all designated states VESUVIUS CRUCIBLE COMPANY 27 Noblestown Road Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15106 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUPTA, Amul 1741 Park Meadow Drive Jamestown, New York 14701 / US | 02 /
WINDER, Dr. Steven M. 30 Hemlock Drive Grand Island, New York 14702 / US | [2006/42] | Representative(s) | Becker, Thomas Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/20] | Becker, Thomas Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | ||
Former [2006/42] | Debled, Thierry Vesuvius Group S.A. Intellectual Property Department Rue de Douvrain, 17 7011 Ghlin / BE | Application number, filing date | 04816024.6 | 30.12.2004 | [2006/42] | WO2004US44042 | Priority number, date | US20040533990P | 02.01.2004 Original published format: US 533990 P | [2006/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005068393 | Date: | 28.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1711445 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1711445 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.07.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/484, C04B35/109 | [2008/49] | CPC: |
C04B35/484 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3201 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3206 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3208 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3232 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3248 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3272 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3409 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3418 (EP,US);
C04B2235/36 (EP,US);
C04B2235/72 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/42] | C04B35/484 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHMELZGEGOSSENE FEUERFESTE MATERIALIEN AUF DER BASIS VON ZIRKONIUMOXID MIT HOHEM ELEKTRISCHEN WIDERSTAND | [2011/11] | English: | FUSION - CAST ZIRCONIA REFRACTORY WITH HIGH ELECTRICAL RESISTIVITY | [2011/11] | French: | REFRACTAIRE COULE PAR FUSION A BASE DE ZIRCONE AYANT UNE RESISTIVITE ELECTRIQUE ELEVEE | [2011/11] |
Former [2006/42] | BEGRENZUNGSWAND MIT HOHEM ELEKTRISCHEN WIDERSTAND | ||
Former [2006/42] | FUSION-CAST REFRACTORY WITH HIGH ELECTRICAL RESISTIVITY | ||
Former [2006/42] | REFRACTAIRE COULE PAR FUSION AYANT UNE RESISTIVITE ELECTRIQUE ELEVEE | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2006 | Search fee paid | 02.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 27.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 22.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.03.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.05.2011 | BE | 25.05.2011 | CY | 25.05.2011 | DK | 25.05.2011 | EE | 25.05.2011 | FI | 25.05.2011 | LT | 25.05.2011 | NL | 25.05.2011 | PL | 25.05.2011 | RO | 25.05.2011 | SE | 25.05.2011 | SI | 25.05.2011 | SK | 25.05.2011 | TR | 25.05.2011 | BG | 25.08.2011 | GR | 26.08.2011 | ES | 05.09.2011 | IS | 25.09.2011 | PT | 26.09.2011 | GB | 30.12.2011 | IE | 30.12.2011 | LU | 30.12.2011 | CH | 31.12.2011 | LI | 31.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/29] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
BG | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
GB | 30.12.2011 | ||
IE | 30.12.2011 | ||
LU | 30.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
GB | 30.12.2011 | ||
IE | 30.12.2011 | ||
LU | 30.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
GB | 30.12.2011 | ||
IE | 30.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
GB | 30.12.2011 | ||
IE | 30.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/46] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
GB | 30.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 25.05.2011 | |
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 25.05.2011 | |
PT | 26.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2478622 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * Page 7, upper table, samples P4 - P8; Clams 1-5; *; | [X]FR2587025 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4,6,7 * Page 5, lines 25-36; Page 10, sample S4; Abstract;;; claims 1-7 *; | [Y]EP0431445 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH04193766 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [X] 1-8 * abstract *; | [Y]FR2692886 (ASAHI GLASS CY INC [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * Page 13; samples 13 and 15; abstract; claims 1-4. *; | [X]DE4403161 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8 * Page 7. samples 1-4; Page 8, samples 5,7,8; Page 9, samples 9-12; Abstarct;;; claims 1-4 *; | [X]JPH06287059 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [X] 1-8 * abstract *; | [X]FR2723583 (TOSHIBA MONOFRAX [JP]) [X] 1,4,6,7 * Page 27, 3xample 12; Claim 1 *; | [Y]JPH0848573 (TOSHIBA MONOFRAX) [Y] 1-8 * abstract *; | [Y]JPH08277162 (TOSHIBA MONOFRAX) [Y] 1-8* abstract * | International search | [X]US5679612 (ENDO SHIGEO [JP], et al) |