EP1702090 - ZINC OR ZINC ALLOY DEPOSITION INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2011 | Opposition rejected | published on 04.05.2011 [2011/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coventya SAS 51, rue Pierre 92110 Clichy / FR | [2006/42] |
Former [2006/38] | For all designated states Conventya SAS 51 Rue Pierre 92110 Clichy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GONZALEZ, François 14, rue des Ardennes F-95660 Champagne sur Oise / FR | 02 /
POMMIER, Nicolas 17, rue Malakoff F-92600 Asnières sur Seine / FR | 03 /
THIERY, Lionel 23, rue Pierre Beregovoy F-92110 Clichy / FR | 04 /
DUPRAT, Jean-Jacques 20, rue des 3 Abbés F-93700 Drancy / FR | [2006/38] | Representative(s) | Eidelsberg, Victor Albert, et al Cabinet Flechner 22, avenue de Friedland F-75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/38] | Eidelsberg, Victor Albert, et al Cabinet Flechner 22, avenue de Friedland F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04816453.7 | 21.12.2004 | [2006/38] | WO2004FR03321 | Priority number, date | FR20030015595 | 31.12.2003 Original published format: FR 0315595 | [2006/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005073438 | Date: | 11.08.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1702090 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1702090 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C25D17/10, C25D3/56 | [2006/38] | CPC: |
C25D17/02 (EP);
C25D17/10 (EP);
C25D3/565 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ABSCHEIDUNG VON ZINK ODER ZINKLEGIERUNGEN | [2006/38] | English: | ZINC OR ZINC ALLOY DEPOSITION INSTALLATION | [2006/38] | French: | INSTALLATION DE DEPOT DE ZINC OU D'ALLIAGES DE ZINC | [2006/38] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 29.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.06.2008
10.02.2009
WITHDRAWN EWH Industrieanlagen GmbH & Co. KG Westerhaar 56-58 58739 Wickede/Ruhr / DE Opponent's representative Roth, Carla, et al, et al König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 09 46 40509 Düsseldorf / DE | 02
26.06.2008
07.07.2008
ADMISSIBLE MKS IP Association Erasmusstrasse 20 10553 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.06.2008
10.02.2009
WITHDRAWN EWH Industrieanlagen GmbH & Co. KG Westerhaar 56-58 58739 Wickede/Ruhr / DE Opponent's representative Roth, Carla, et al, et al König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Lohengrinstraße 11 D-40549 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
26.06.2008
07.07.2008
ADMISSIBLE ATOTECH Deutschland GmbH Erasmusstrasse 20 10553 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | |||
Former [2008/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.06.2008
07.07.2008
ADMISSIBLE EWH Industrieanlagen GmbH & Co. KG Westerhaar 56-58 58739 Wickede/Ruhr / DE Opponent's representative Schönbohm, Carla, et al, et al König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Lohengrinstraße 11 D-40549 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
26.06.2008
ADMISSIBLE ATOTECH Deutschland GmbH Erasmusstrasse 20 10553 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | |||
Former [2008/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.06.2008
EWH Industrieanlagen GmbH & Co. KG Westerhaar 56-58 58739 Wickede/Ruhr / DE Opponent's representative Schönbohm, Carla, et al, et al König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Lohengrinstraße 11 D-40549 Düsseldorf / DE | 31.07.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.01.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.12.2010 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2011/18] | 10.12.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.12.2010 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 21.12.2010 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.09.2007 | EE | 26.09.2007 | FI | 26.09.2007 | IE | 26.09.2007 | LT | 26.09.2007 | NL | 26.09.2007 | RO | 26.09.2007 | SI | 26.09.2007 | LU | 21.12.2007 | BG | 26.12.2007 | GR | 27.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | IS | 26.01.2008 | PT | 26.02.2008 | HU | 27.03.2008 | [2009/41] |
Former [2009/36] | CY | 26.09.2007 | |
EE | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
IE | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SI | 26.09.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | EE | 26.09.2007 | |
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
IE | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SI | 26.09.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | EE | 26.09.2007 | |
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
IE | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/45] | FI | 26.09.2007 | |
IE | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/33] | FI | 26.09.2007 | |
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | FI | 26.09.2007 | |
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | FI | 26.09.2007 | |
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/22] | FI | 26.09.2007 | |
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 26.09.2007 | |
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | LT | 26.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2037346 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1-12* claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0048579 (GKN VANDERVELL LTD [GB]) [A] 1-12 * page 2, lines 13-20 * * page 4, lines 3-17 *; | [A]WO0006807 (HILLEBRAND WALTER GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 1, lines 14-25 * * page 4, lines 5-20 * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO0196631 (TASKEM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 6, line 19 - page 9, line 22 * * figure 1 * |