EP1706610 - DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE TEMPERATURE OF FLUIDS CIRCULATING IN A HEAT ENGINE VEHICLE AND METHOD USED BY SAID DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA Route de Gisy 78943 Vélizy-Villacoublay Cedex / FR | [2011/06] |
Former [2006/40] | For all designated states Peugeot Citroen Automobiles SA Route de Gizy 78943 Vélizy-Villacoublay Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUDARD, Emmanuel 74 avenue Joseph Kessel F-78960 Voisins le Bretonneux / FR | 02 /
LE LIEVRE, Armel 21, sentier des Tribouillards F-78360 Montesson / FR | 03 /
BARTOLETTI, Mathieu 3 rue des Cottages F-75018 Paris / FR | [2006/40] | Representative(s) | Ménès, Catherine, et al PSA Automobiles SA VPIB - LG081 18 rue des Fauvelles 92250 La Garenne Colombes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Ménès, Catherine, et al Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA DRIA/PPIQ/BLE 18, rue des Fauvelles 92250 La Garenne Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2006/40] | Thinat, Michel Cabinet Weinstein 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04816474.3 | 22.12.2004 | [2006/40] | WO2004FR03347 | Priority number, date | FR20030015272 | 23.12.2003 Original published format: FR 0315272 | [2006/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005064133 | Date: | 14.07.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1706610 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1706610 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F01P3/20, F01P11/20, B60H1/00, F02N19/10 | [2010/37] | CPC: |
F02N19/10 (EP,US);
B60H1/00314 (EP,US);
B60H1/00492 (EP,US);
F01P11/20 (EP,US);
F01P3/20 (EP,US);
F01P2011/205 (EP,US);
F01P2060/04 (EP,US);
F01P2060/08 (EP,US);
F01P2060/16 (EP,US);
F01P7/165 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/40] | F01P3/20, F01P11/20, B60H1/00, F02N17/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG DER TEMPERATUR VON IN EINEM VERBRENNUNGSMOTORFAHRZEUG ZIRKULIERENDEN FLUIDEN UND VON DER VORRICHTUNG VERWENDETES VERFAHREN | [2006/40] | English: | DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE TEMPERATURE OF FLUIDS CIRCULATING IN A HEAT ENGINE VEHICLE AND METHOD USED BY SAID DEVICE | [2006/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REGULATION THERMIQUE DE FLUIDES CIRCULANT DANS UN VEHICULE A MOTEUR THERMIQUE ET PROCEDE MIS EN OEUVRE PAR CE DISPOSITIF | [2006/40] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/40] | 19.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10168097.3 / EP2241733 | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.02.2011 | CY | 09.02.2011 | CZ | 09.02.2011 | DK | 09.02.2011 | EE | 09.02.2011 | FI | 09.02.2011 | HU | 09.02.2011 | IE | 09.02.2011 | IS | 09.02.2011 | IT | 09.02.2011 | LT | 09.02.2011 | NL | 09.02.2011 | PL | 09.02.2011 | RO | 09.02.2011 | SE | 09.02.2011 | SI | 09.02.2011 | SK | 09.02.2011 | TR | 09.02.2011 | BG | 09.05.2011 | GR | 10.05.2011 | ES | 20.05.2011 | PT | 09.06.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
IE | 09.02.2011 | ||
IS | 09.02.2011 | ||
IT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
TR | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
IE | 09.02.2011 | ||
IS | 09.02.2011 | ||
IT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
IE | 09.02.2011 | ||
IT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
IE | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
IE | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 09.02.2011 | |
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 09.02.2011 | |
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4032701 (SCHATZ OSKAR [DE]) [A] 1-5,15-17 * column 4, line 34 - column 7, line 16; figure 1 *; | [YA]US5215044 (BANZHAF MATTHIAS [DE], et al) [Y] 17 * column 2, lines 33-41 * * column 7, line 65 - column 8, line 14; figure 6 * [A] 1-16; | [A]EP0593942 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 2-5,17-20 * column 1, line 49 - column 3, line 46; figures 2A-2D *; | [A]DE19521292 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [A] 2-5,9,10,12,13,15-20 * column 1, line 44 - column 3, line 31; figure . *; | [A]US5730089 (MORIKAWA TOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,12,15,17-21* column 3, line 18 - column 8, line 35; figures 1,2,4 *; | [XAY]DE19750721 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,6,7,12,13,15,16 * column 3, lines 4-17 - column 4, lines 1-6; figure 3 * [A] 3,4,9,10 [Y] 17; | [XA]US2003089319 (DUVINAGE FRANK [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,12,13,15,16 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0058]; figure 1 * [A] 9,10,17 | by applicant | DE19750721 |