EP1831131 - PHOTOCATALYTIC AUTO-CLEANING PROCESS OF STAINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Council of Scientific and Industrial Research Rafi Marg New Delhi 110 001 / IN | [2010/04] |
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states COUNCIL OF SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH Rafi Marg New Delhi 110 001 / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHUKLA, Dipak, Balvantrai Central Salt and Marine Chemicals Research Institute Bhavnagar 364 002 Gujarat / IN | 02 /
JASRA, Raksh, Vir Central Salt and Marine Chemicals Research Institute Bhavnagar 364 002 Gujarat / IN | 03 /
GHOSH, Pushpito, Kumar Central Salt Marine Chemicals Research Institute Bhavnagar 364 002 Gujarat / IN | 04 /
TAYADE, Rajesh, Jagannath Central Salt and Marine Chemicals Research Institute Bhavnagar 364 002 Gujarat / IN | 05 /
BHATT, Anjani, Ketan Central Salt and Marine Chemicals Research Institute Bhavnagar 364 002 Gujarat / IN | [2007/37] | Representative(s) | Maiwald, Walter Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/37] | Maiwald, Walter Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04816680.5 | 28.12.2004 | [2007/37] | WO2004IN00428 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006070395 | Date: | 06.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1831131 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1831131 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C04B41/87, C03C17/25 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
C04B41/5041 (EP);
C04B41/80 (KR);
C04B41/87 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2008/07] |
Former [2007/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR PHOTOKATALYTISCHEN SELBSTREINIGUNG VON FLECKEN | [2007/37] | English: | PHOTOCATALYTIC AUTO-CLEANING PROCESS OF STAINS | [2007/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AUTONETTOYAGE PHOTOCATALYTIQUE DE TÂCHES | [2007/37] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 31.07.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.09.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH10237354 ; | [XA]JP2002293667 ; | [X]US6037289 (CHOPIN THIERRY [FR], et al); | [A]US6300299 (MURPHY PETER M [US], et al); | [X]US2002182334 (MARZOLIN CHRISTIAN [FR], et al); | [X]WO03022462 (ADSIL LC [US], et al); | [X]US6569520 (JACOBS JEFFRY L [US]); |