EP1608534 - ACTIVE DRAG AND THRUST MODULATION SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states P Tech, LLC 1303 West Evergreen Avenue Effingham, IL 62401 / US | [2010/22] |
Former [2005/52] | For all designated states Bonutti 2003 Trust-A 1303 Evergreen Avenue, P.O. Box 1387 Effingham IL 62041 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONUTTI, Peter M. 1303 Evergreen Avenue, P.O. Box 1387 Effingham, IL 62401 / US | [2005/52] | Representative(s) | Hocking, Adrian Niall Albright IP Limited County House Bayshill Road Cheltenham, Glos. GL50 3BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | Seeger · Seeger · Lindner Partnerschaft Patentanwälte Paosostrasse 95 81249 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/52] | Lindner, Manfred Klaus Patentanwälte Walter-Eggers-Lindner Göllheimer Strasse 5 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04816724.1 | 11.03.2004 | [2005/52] | WO2004US07414 | Priority number, date | US20030386992 | 12.03.2003 Original published format: US 386992 | [2005/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005039931 | Date: | 06.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1608534 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B64C23/00, B62D35/00, B63B1/34, B63H25/52, F15D1/12 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
B63H9/06 (EP,US);
F15D1/0075 (US);
B60C19/00 (EP,US);
B62D35/00 (EP,US);
B63B1/34 (EP,US);
B64C23/005 (EP,US);
F02M27/08 (EP,US);
F02M69/041 (EP,US);
F15D1/12 (EP,US);
B63B2039/068 (EP,US);
B64C2230/02 (EP,US);
F02B2075/125 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y02T50/10 (EP,US);
Y02T70/10 (EP,US);
Y02T70/5236 (EP,US);
Y10T137/0391 (EP,US);
Y10T137/206 (EP,US);
Y10T137/2191 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/08] | B64C23/00 | ||
Former IPC [2005/52] | B60R1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKTIVES LUFTWIDERSTANDS- UND SCHUBMODULATIONSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2005/52] | English: | ACTIVE DRAG AND THRUST MODULATION SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2005/52] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE MODULATION ACTIVE DE TRAINEE ET DE POUSSEE | [2005/52] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2005 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 10.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/04] | 17.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.08.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 03.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 06.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 02.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   12.08.2014 | 31.03.2015 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   24.06.2015 | 31.03.2016 | 13   M06   Fee paid on   03.08.2016 | 31.03.2019 | 16   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4363991 (EDELMAN SEYMOUR) [Y] 2,27 * abstract * * column 3, lines 48-55 * * column 5, line 36 - column 6, line 3 *; | [X]EP0264144 (BOEING CO [US]) [X] 15,16,22 * abstract * * column 2, lines 1-44 * * column 4, lines 3-12,41-48 * * column 5, line 3 - column 6, line 9 * * column 6, lines 43-56 * * column 7, lines 10-24,43-51; claims 1-3 *; | [XY]US4741498 (GERHARDT HEINZ A A [US]) [X] 1,3-26,28,29 * abstract * * column 1, lines 8-12,35-50 * * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 10 * * column 3, lines 28-32,41-49 * * column 4, lines 11-50 * * column 4, line 68 - column 5, line 4 * * column 5, line 47 - column 6, line 13 * * column 6, lines 34-41; claims 1,5,6,15,19,20 * [Y] 2,27; | [X]US4932610 (MAESTRELLO LUCIO [US]) [X] 15-17,21,22,24-28 * figures 2-5,8 * * column 2, lines 17-44 * * column 3, lines 24,25 * * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 48 *; | [PX]FR2859160 (RENAULT SA [FR]) [PX] 15-17,21,22,24-26 * abstract * * page 1, lines 4-13 * * page 1, line 30 - page 2, line 4 * * page 2, line 21 - page 3, line 6 * * page 3, lines 14-19 * * page 4, lines 9-21 * * page 10, lines 19-28 ** page 13, lines 26,27 * | International search | [X]US4363991 (EDELMAN SEYMOUR); | [X]US4741498 (GERHARDT HEINZ A A [US]); | [X]US4932610 (MAESTRELLO LUCIO [US]); | [X]US5365490 (KATZ RICHARD A [US]); | [A]US5797563 (BLACKBURN RONALD F [US], et al) |