EP1685074 - METHOD OF FORMING MICROSTRUCTURES ON A SUBSTRATE AND A MICROSTRUCTURED ASSEMBLY USED FOR SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.07.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOKOYAMA, Chikafumi 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
SUGIMOTO, Takaki 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2006/31] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/31] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04816912.2 | 08.10.2004 | [2006/31] | WO2004US33170 | Priority number, date | US20030698200 | 31.10.2003 Original published format: US 698200 | [2006/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005042427 | Date: | 12.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1685074 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C03C17/00 | [2006/31] | CPC: |
C03C17/008 (EP,US);
H01J9/24 (KR);
B29C33/424 (EP,US);
B32B17/06 (EP,KR,US);
H01J11/12 (EP,US);
H01J11/36 (EP,KR,US);
H01J9/242 (EP,US);
B29C33/10 (EP,US);
B29L2031/3475 (EP,US);
C03C2218/119 (EP,US);
C09K2323/021 (EP,US);
H01J2211/36 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUSBILDUNG VON MIKROSTRUKTUREN AUF EINEM SUBSTRAT UND DAFÜR VERWENDETE MIKROSTRUKTURIERTE ANORDNUNG | [2006/31] | English: | METHOD OF FORMING MICROSTRUCTURES ON A SUBSTRATE AND A MICROSTRUCTURED ASSEMBLY USED FOR SAME | [2006/31] | French: | PROCEDE DE FORMATION DE MICROSTRUCTURES SUR UN SUBSTRAT ET ENSEMBLE MICROSTRUCTURE UTILISANT UN TEL PROCEDE | [2006/31] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/31] | 23.05.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/32] | 20.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.08.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2000137442 ; | [X]JP2002055624 ; | [A]WO0120636 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [A] 1-19* claim - *; | [A]US2003098528 (CHIU RAYMOND CHI-HING [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0046] , [0051]; claim 16 *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001006), vol. 2000, no. 08, & JP2000137442 A 20000516 (SUMITOMO CHEM CO LTD) [X] 18,19 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 41, Database accession no. 2002-377190, XP002326562 & JP2002055624 A 20020220 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND LTD) [X] 18,19 * abstract * |