EP1702304 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SUPER-RESOLUTION OF CONFOCAL IMAGES ACQUIRED THROUGH AN IMAGE GUIDE, AND DEVICE USED FOR IMPLEMENTING SUCH A METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mauna Kea Technologies 9, rue d'Enghien 75010 Paris / FR | [2006/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERIER, Frédéric Streat Lamboal Ruscumunoc F-29810 Plouarzel / FR | 02 /
PERCHANT, Aymeric 110, boulevard Blanqui F-75013 Paris / FR | [2006/38] | Representative(s) | Pontet, Bernard, et al Pontet Allano & Associés Parc Les Algorithmes, Bâtiment Platon CS 70003 Saint Aubin 91192 Gif sur Yvette Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Pontet, Bernard, et al Pontet Allano & Associés s.e.l.a.r.l. 25, rue Jean-Rostand Parc Club Orsay Université 91893 Orsay Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2006/38] | Pontet, Bernard, et al Pontet Allano & Associés s.e.l.a.r.l. 25, rue Jean-Rostand Parc Club Orsay Université 91893 Orsay Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 04817612.7 | 29.12.2004 | [2006/38] | WO2004FR03401 | Priority number, date | FR20030015628 | 31.12.2003 Original published format: FR 0315628 | [2006/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005073912 | Date: | 11.08.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1702304 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1702304 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06T3/40 | [2011/37] | CPC: |
G06T3/4053 (EP,US);
G06T5/50 (KR);
G02B6/00 (KR);
G06T5/00 (KR);
G06T2207/10056 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30004 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/38] | G06T5/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/38] | Extension states | AL | 21.07.2006 | BA | 21.07.2006 | HR | 21.07.2006 | LV | 21.07.2006 | MK | 21.07.2006 | YU | 21.07.2006 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM FÜR SUPERAUFLÖSUNG VON DURCH EINE BILDFÜHRUNG BESCHAFFTEN KONFOKALEN BILDERN UND ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG EINES SOLCHEN VERFAHRENS VERWENDETE EINRICHTUNG | [2006/38] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SUPER-RESOLUTION OF CONFOCAL IMAGES ACQUIRED THROUGH AN IMAGE GUIDE, AND DEVICE USED FOR IMPLEMENTING SUCH A METHOD | [2006/38] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE SUPER-RESOLUTION D'IMAGES CONFOCALES ACQUISES A TRAVERS UN GUIDE D'IMAGE, ET DISPOSITIF UTILISE POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE D'UN TEL PROCEDE | [2006/38] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 17.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.10.2006 | Opposition(s) | 30.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.12.2004 | AT | 29.02.2012 | CY | 29.02.2012 | CZ | 29.02.2012 | DK | 29.02.2012 | EE | 29.02.2012 | FI | 29.02.2012 | IE | 29.02.2012 | LT | 29.02.2012 | NL | 29.02.2012 | PL | 29.02.2012 | RO | 29.02.2012 | SE | 29.02.2012 | SI | 29.02.2012 | SK | 29.02.2012 | TR | 29.02.2012 | BG | 29.05.2012 | GR | 30.05.2012 | IS | 29.06.2012 | PT | 29.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
TR | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 29.02.2012 | |
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 29.02.2012 | |
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 29.02.2012 | |
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 29.02.2012 | |
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 29.02.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4618884 (NAGASAKI TATSUO [JP]) [X] 14 * abstract * * column 1, line 23 - line 29 * * column 3, line 21 - line 26 * * column 3, line 33 - line 36 * * column 6, line 43 - line 50 * [Y] 18; | [X]EP0731600 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]EP1001374 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [XY]US6466618 (MESSING DEAN [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * figures 3,10; claim 1 * [Y] 18; | [A] - LEE S ET AL, "SCATTERED DATA INTERPOLATION WITH MULTILEVEL B-SPLINES", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VISUALIZATION AND COMPUTER GRAPHICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19970701), vol. 3, no. 3, ISSN 1077-2626, pages 228 - 244, XP000702051 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/2945.620490 | by applicant | US4618884 | US6466618 |