EP1673072 - A CONTROLLED RELEASE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION AND A PROCESS FOR PREPARING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lupin Limited 159 C.S.T. Road, Kalina, Santacruz (East) Mumbai 400 098 Maharashtra / IN | [N/P] |
Former [2006/26] | For all designated states Lupin Limited 159 C.S.T. Road, Kalina, Santacruz (East) Mumbai 400 098 Maharashtra / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEN, Himadri Lupin Research Park, 46/47 A, Nande Village Taluka Mulshi, Pune 411 042, Maharashtra / IN | 02 /
JAYANTHI, Suryakumar Lupin Research Park, 46/47 A, Nande Village Taluka Mulshi, Pune 411 042, Maharashtra / IN | 03 /
RAGHAVAN, Vineeth Lupin Research Park, 46/47 A, Nande Village Taluka Mulshi, Pune 411 042, Maharashtra / IN | 04 /
ARRA, Ganga, Srinivas Lupin Research Park, 46/47 A, Nande Village Taluka Mulshi, Pune 411 042, Maharashtra / IN | [2006/26] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | ||
Former [2006/26] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall, Belgrave Street Leeds, LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 04817650.7 | 29.09.2004 | [2006/26] | WO2004IN00306 | Priority number, date | IN2003MUM0417 | 01.10.2003 Original published format: IN MU04172003 | [2006/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005048978 | Date: | 02.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1673072 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1673072 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20 | [2006/26] | CPC: |
A61K9/209 (EP,US);
A61P31/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/26] | Extension states | AL | 10.04.2006 | HR | 10.04.2006 | LT | 10.04.2006 | LV | 10.04.2006 | MK | 10.04.2006 | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT KONTROLLIERTER FREISETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2006/26] | English: | A CONTROLLED RELEASE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION AND A PROCESS FOR PREPARING THE SAME | [2006/26] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE A LIBERATION CONTROLEE ET PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE CETTE COMPOSITION | [2006/26] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/26] | 27.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.04.2007 | CY | 04.04.2007 | CZ | 04.04.2007 | DK | 04.04.2007 | EE | 04.04.2007 | FI | 04.04.2007 | NL | 04.04.2007 | PL | 04.04.2007 | RO | 04.04.2007 | SI | 04.04.2007 | SK | 04.04.2007 | TR | 04.04.2007 | BG | 04.07.2007 | SE | 04.07.2007 | GR | 05.07.2007 | PT | 04.09.2007 | MC | 30.09.2007 | IE | 01.10.2007 | HU | 05.10.2007 | [2013/51] |
Former [2009/44] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CY | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
RO | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
TR | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
IE | 01.10.2007 | ||
HU | 05.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CY | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
RO | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
IE | 01.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
RO | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
IE | 01.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
RO | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
IE | 01.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
RO | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | SI | 04.04.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]ZA200110500 ; | [A]WO0018383 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-54 * claim - *; | [A]US6177435 (LARDER BRENDAN ALEXANDER [GB], et al) [A] 1-54 * claim - * * column 1, line 27 - line 41 * * column 3, line 7 - line 65 * * column 5, line 3 - line 14 * * column 6, line 55 - line 62 * * example - *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 75, Database accession no. 2002-699216, XP002357486 & ZA200110500 A 20020529 (CIPLA MEDPRO PTY LTD) [A] 1-54 * abstract * |