EP1667634 - ANTHRAX VACCINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | [2010/10] |
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAULFIELD, Michael, J. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 02 /
COOK, James, C., III 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 03 /
JOYCE, Joseph, G. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | [2006/24] | Representative(s) | Man, Jocelyn, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited Hertford Road, Hoddesdon Hertfordshire, EN11 9BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | Man, Jocelyn, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited, Hertford Road, Hoddesdon Hertfordshire, EN11 9BU / GB | ||
Former [2006/24] | Man, Jocelyn, et al Merck & Co.,Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 04817743.0 | 30.07.2004 | [2006/24] | WO2004US25033 | Priority number, date | US20030491478P | 30.07.2003 Original published format: US 491478 P | [2006/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005048918 | Date: | 02.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1667634 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/385, A61K39/02, A61K39/116, A61K39/07, A61K38/16 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
A61K39/07 (EP,US);
A61K39/095 (EP,US);
C07K14/32 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55505 (EP,US);
A61K2039/6068 (EP,US);
A61K2039/70 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/24] | A61K6/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTHRAX-VAKZINE | [2006/24] | English: | ANTHRAX VACCINE | [2006/24] | French: | VACCIN CONTRE L'ANTHRAX | [2006/24] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 14.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/34] | 08.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/34] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.05.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 11.05.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2005000884 (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US], et al) [E] 1-3,5,7,10 * page 2, line 5 - line 12 * * page 6, line 26 - page 7, line 6 * * page 12, line 35 - page 15, line 27 * * page 20, line 20 - page 27, line 12; example - *; | [E]WO2005007804 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al) [E] 1-3,5,7,9,10 * page 2, line 20 - page 4, line 23 ** page 6, line 2 - page 7, line 30; example - *; | [DX] - RACHEL SCHNEERSON ET AL., "Poly(gamma-D-glutamic acid) protein conjugates induce IgG antibodies in mice to the capsule of Bacillus anthracis: A potential addition to the anthrax vaccine", PNAS, (20030722), vol. 100, no. 15, pages 8945 - 8950, XP002306072 [DX] 1-3,5-7,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1633512100 | [X] - GEORGE SENYK ET AL., "The immune response to Glucagon in conjugated form", IMMUNOCHEMISTRY, (1972), vol. 9, pages 97 - 110, XP009039720 [X] 1-3 * page 98, paragraph L - page 99, paragraph 1 * * page 107, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0019-2791(72)90031-6 | [A] - ELIZABETH C. KING ET AL., "Covalent modification in aqueous solution of Poly-gamma-D-Glutamic acid from Bacillus licheniformis", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE PART A: POLYMER CHEMISTRY, (1998), vol. 36, pages 1995 - 1999, XP003011146 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1099-0518(19980915)36:12<1995::AID-POLA4>3.0.CO;2-N | [PX] - GI-EUN RHIE ET AL., "A dually active anthrax vaccine that confers protection against both bacilli and toxins", PNAS, (20030916), vol. 100, no. 19, pages 10925 - 10930, XP002306076 [PX] 1,5,7,10 * abstract * * page 1095, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 10925, column R, paragraph L - page 1096, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 10926, column L, paragraph 3 * * page 10927, column L, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1834478100 | [PX] - EMMANUEL PRODHOMME ET AL., "Multivalent conjugates of Poly-gamma-D-glutamic acid from Bacillus licheniformis with antibody F(ab') and glycopeptide ligands", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (20031106), vol. 14, pages 1148 - 1155, XP003001051 [PX] 1-3 * abstract * * page 1148, column R, paragraph 3 - page 1153, column R, paragraph 2 * | International search | [X] - PRODHOMME J.-P.F. ET AL., "Poly gamma-D-glutamic acid as a template forfunctionalized water-soluble biomaterials", ABSTRACTS OF THE 219TH ACS NATIONAL MEETING, SAN FRANCISCO, CA, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON D.C. # 133, (20000326), XP009039728 | [XP] - PRODHOMME E.J.F. ET AL., "Multivalent conjugates of poly-gamma-D-glutamic acid from Bacillus licheniformis with antibody F(ab') and glycopeptide ligands", BIOCONJUGATE CHEM., (200311), vol. 14, pages 1148 - 1155, XP003001051 | [Y] - GOODMAN J.W. ET AL., "Immunochemical studies on the poly-gamma-D-glutamyl capsulae of Bacillus anthracis. III. The activity with rabbit antisera of peptides derived from the homologous polypeptide", BIOCHEMISTRY, (196802), vol. 7, no. 2, pages 706 - 710, XP001203672 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00852a013 | [Y] - SENYK G. ET AL., "The immune response to glucagon in conjugated form", IMMUNOCHEMISTRY, (1972), vol. 9, pages 97 - 110, XP009039720 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0019-2791(72)90031-6 | [XP] - RHIE G. ET AL., "A dually active anthrax vaccine that confers protection against both bacilli and toxins", PNAS, (20030916), vol. 100, no. 19, pages 10925 - 10930, XP002306076 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1834478100 | [A] - KING E.C. ET AL., "Covalent modification in aqueous solution of poly-gamma-D-glutamic acid from Bacillus licheniformis", J. POLYMER SCI. PART A, (199809), vol. 36, no. 12, pages 1995 - 1999, XP003011146 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1099-0518(19980915)36:12<1995::AID-POLA4>3.0.CO;2-N | [X] - SCHNEERSON R. ET AL., "Poly(gamma-D-glutamic acid) protein conjugates induce IgG antibodies in mice to the capsulae of Bacillus anthracis: A potential addition to the anthrax vaccine", PNAS, (20030722), vol. 100, no. 15, pages 8945 - 8950, XP002306072 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1633512100 |