EP1683343 - WIRELESS MULTI-RECORDER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2006/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOMPPANEN, Jarmo Laukontori 6 B As. 3 FI-33200 Tampere / FI | [2006/30] | Representative(s) | Pursiainen, Timo Pekka, et al Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy Visiokatu 1 33720 Tampere / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Pursiainen, Timo Pekka, et al Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy Hermiankatu 1 B 33720 Tampere / FI | ||
Former [2006/30] | Pursiainen, Timo Pekka, et al Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy, Hermiankatu 12 B 33720 Tampere / FI | Application number, filing date | 04818435.2 | 11.11.2004 | [2006/30] | WO2004FI50160 | Priority number, date | FI20030001657 | 14.11.2003 Original published format: FI 20031657 | [2006/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005048584 | Date: | 26.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1683343 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 26.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/00, H04N7/18, G06F15/16 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
H04N5/0733 (EP,US);
H04N5/073 (KR);
H04N5/91 (KR);
H04N7/18 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSES MEHRRECORDERSYSTEM | [2006/30] | English: | WIRELESS MULTI-RECORDER SYSTEM | [2006/30] | French: | SYSTEME A ENREGISTREURS MULTIPLES SANS FIL | [2006/30] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 17.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 13.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/47] | 05.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002049852 (LEE YEN-JEN [US], et al); | [X]US2002057340 (FERNANDEZ DENNIS SUNGA [US], et al); | [X]JP2001326845 ; | [Y]US5877819 (BRANSON PHILIP J [US]); | [XP]US6697103 (FERNANDEZ DENNIS SUNGA [US], et al); | [XP]US2004118268 (LUDWIG LESTER F [US]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020403), vol. 2002, no. 03, & JP2001326845 A 20011122 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) | Examination | US2002135682 |