EP1687834 - SPINDLE DRIVE FOR A CIRCUIT BREAKER AND/OR EARTHING SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Technology AG Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | [2014/17] |
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states ABB Technology AG Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALDI, Wolfgang Ortsstrasse 14 69226 Nussloch-Maisbach / DE | 02 /
HUG, Kuno Steinbachweg 14 69118 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
BETZ, Thomas Am Knuss 18 63505 Langenselbold / DE | 04 /
THOMAS, Volker Fritz-Erler-Str. 25 63456 Hanau / DE | 05 /
NEUMAIER, Heinrich Hauptstrasse 2 77756 Hausach / DE | 06 /
KLONECKI, Peter Alzeyer Str. 62 65934 Frankfurt / DE | 07 /
RIES, Christian Hinterm Galgen 6 64839 Münster / DE | [2006/32] | Representative(s) | Miller, Toivo ABB Patent GmbH Wallstadter Strasse 59 68520 Ladenburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/17] | Miller, Toivo ABB Patent GmbH, Wallstadter Strasse 59 68520 Ladenburg / DE | ||
Former [2006/32] | Miller, Toivo ABB Patent GmbH, Wallstadter Strasse 59 68520 Ladenburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04818788.4 | 17.11.2004 | [2006/32] | WO2004EP13003 | Priority number, date | DE2003154595 | 21.11.2003 Original published format: DE 10354595 | [2006/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005050685 | Date: | 02.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1687834 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1687834 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01H3/40, H01H3/26 | [2006/32] | CPC: |
H01H3/264 (EP,US);
H01H69/00 (KR);
H01H3/40 (EP,US);
H01H71/08 (KR);
H01H71/10 (KR);
H01H2003/405 (EP,US);
H01H31/003 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/32] | Title | German: | SPINDELANTRIEB FÜR EINEN TRENN-UND/ODER ERDUNGSSCHALTER | [2006/32] | English: | SPINDLE DRIVE FOR A CIRCUIT BREAKER AND/OR EARTHING SWITCH | [2006/32] | French: | MECANISME D'ENTRAINEMENT PAR ARBRE DESTINE A UN DISJONCTEUR ET/OU UN INTERRUPTEUR DE MISE A LA TERRE | [2006/32] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 22.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2009 | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.11.2004 | CY | 23.04.2014 | CZ | 23.04.2014 | DK | 23.04.2014 | EE | 23.04.2014 | ES | 23.04.2014 | FI | 23.04.2014 | IT | 23.04.2014 | MC | 23.04.2014 | NL | 23.04.2014 | PL | 23.04.2014 | RO | 23.04.2014 | SE | 23.04.2014 | SI | 23.04.2014 | SK | 23.04.2014 | TR | 23.04.2014 | BG | 23.07.2014 | GR | 24.07.2014 | IS | 23.08.2014 | PT | 25.08.2014 | AT | 17.11.2014 | GB | 17.11.2014 | IE | 17.11.2014 | LU | 17.11.2014 | BE | 30.11.2014 | CH | 30.11.2014 | LI | 30.11.2014 | FR | 01.12.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/12] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
AT | 17.11.2014 | ||
GB | 17.11.2014 | ||
IE | 17.11.2014 | ||
LU | 17.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/51] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
GB | 17.11.2014 | ||
IE | 17.11.2014 | ||
LU | 17.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/48] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
GB | 17.11.2014 | ||
IE | 17.11.2014 | ||
LU | 17.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
IE | 17.11.2014 | ||
LU | 17.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
LU | 17.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
LU | 17.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
LU | 17.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
LU | 17.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 23.04.2014 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE3608481 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5530414 (REYNOLDS STANFORD W G [ZA]) [A] 1 * figures 2,4 *; | [A]US3198908 (STAAK JULIUS H) [A] * figure - * |