EP1658222 - Rotor hub with variable lead lag damping [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/21] | SOFT IN-PLANE ROTOR HUB | ||
[2012/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bell Helicopter Textron Inc. P.O. Box 482 Fort Worth, TX 76101 / US | [2013/14] |
Former [2006/21] | For all designated states Bell Helicopter Textron Inc. P.O. Box 482 Fort Worth, TX 76101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAMPS, Frank, B. 4705 Mill Crossing West Colleyville, TX 76034 / US | 02 /
SMITH, Michael, R. 1700 Tyler Colleyville, TX 76034 / US | 03 /
BOTHWELL, Christopher, M. 512 Coventry Drive Grapevine, TX 76051 / US | 04 /
CORSO, Lawrence, M. 9204 Glenhaven Court North Richland Hills, TX 76180 / US | 05 /
BRASWELL, James, L., Jr. 106 Williamsburg Court Colleyville, TX 76034 / US | 06 /
POPELKA, David, A. 4705 Mill Brook Colleyville, TX 76034 / US | 07 /
SCHELLHASE, Ernst, C. 8516 Marys Creek Drive Fort Worth, TX 76116 / US | 08 /
HOLLIMON, Charles, L. 6836 Megan Lane North Richland Hills, TX 76180 / US | 09 /
NEWMAN, Thomas, J. 175 E.P. Dawson Road Maypearl, TX 76064 / US | 10 /
BASKIN, Bryan 2804 Hedgeway Drive Arlington, TX 76016 / US | 11 /
CAMPBELL, Thomas, C. 5448 Lake Powell Drive Fort Worth, TX 76137 / US | 12 /
ROBERTSON, Daniel, B. 1222 Ridgewood Circle Southlake, TX 76092 / US | [2006/21] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/14] | Lawrence, John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | ||
Former [2012/08] | Lawrence, John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | ||
Former [2008/45] | Dorschner, David, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | ||
Former [2006/21] | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 04819036.7 | 27.08.2004 | [2006/21] | WO2004US27990 | Priority number, date | US20030498073P | 27.08.2003 Original published format: US 498073 P | [2006/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005049421 | Date: | 02.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1658222 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1658222 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.08.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B64C27/51, F16F13/26, B64C27/39 | [2012/11] | CPC: |
F16F13/08 (EP,US);
B64C27/35 (EP,US);
B64C27/39 (EP,US);
B64C27/51 (EP,US);
F16F13/24 (EP,US);
F16F13/26 (EP,US);
F16F2230/30 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/21] | B64C27/51 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/49] |
Former [2006/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Rotornabe mit variabler Shwenckdämpunfgsrate | [2012/45] | English: | Rotor hub with variable lead lag damping | [2012/45] | French: | Moyeu rotor avec articulation en trainée à amortissement variable | [2012/45] |
Former [2006/21] | WEICHE ROTORNABE IN EINER EBENE | ||
Former [2006/21] | SOFT IN-PLANE ROTOR HUB | ||
Former [2006/21] | MOYEU ROTOR SOUPLE DANS LE PLAN | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 10.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/21] | 30.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2774553 (JENSEN HARRY T) [X] 1,4-9,12-17,23 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,10,11,26; | [Y]US4244677 (NOEHREN WILLIAM L, et al) [Y] 2,3,10,11 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4733854 (MIYAMOTO YASUO [JP]) [Y] 26* the whole document * | International search | [X]US2155427 (LARSEN AGNEW E); | [X]US2754937 (BUIVID MICHEL D); | [X]US2774553 (JENSEN HARRY T); | [Y]US4244677 (NOEHREN WILLIAM L, et al); | [X]US4543040 (MCARDLE FRANCIS H [US], et al) |