EP2842301 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR FACILITATING INTER-SYSTEM HANDOVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2019 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital Technology Corporation 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [2015/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OZLUTURK, Fatih, M. 70 Willowdale Avenue Port Washington, NY 11050 / US | [2015/10] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 1066 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/10] | Johansson, Magnus, et al Awapatent AB Järnvägsgatan 10 A Box 1066 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 04819104.3 | 12.11.2004 | WO2004US37774 | Priority number, date | US20030519761P | 13.11.2003 Original published format: US 519761 P | [2015/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005050965 | Date: | 02.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2842301 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04M11/00 | [2015/10] | CPC: |
H04W36/0061 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W36/24 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W36/30 (KR);
H04W84/12 (KR);
H04W88/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W36/14 (US);
H04W36/1446 (EP,CN,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ERMÖGLICHUNG EINER WEITERREICHUNG ZWISCHEN SYSTEMEN | [2015/10] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR FACILITATING INTER-SYSTEM HANDOVER | [2015/10] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE FACILITATION DU TRANSFERT INTER-SYSTEMES | [2015/10] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2006 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/50] | 08.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/10] | 28.07.2006 | Examination requested [2015/10] | 15.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/46] | 28.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.05.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 22.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.07.2006 | AT   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 20.07.2006 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 20.07.2006 | BG   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 20.07.2006 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 20.07.2006 | CY   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 20.07.2006 | CZ   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 20.07.2006 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 20.07.2006 | DK   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 20.07.2006 | EE   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 20.07.2006 | ES   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 20.07.2006 | FI   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 20.07.2006 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 20.07.2006 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 20.07.2006 | GR   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 20.07.2006 | HU   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 20.07.2006 | IE   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 20.07.2006 | IS   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 20.07.2006 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 20.07.2006 | LU   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 20.07.2006 | MC   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 20.07.2006 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 20.07.2006 | PL   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 20.07.2006 | PT   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 20.07.2006 | RO   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 20.07.2006 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 20.07.2006 | SI   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 20.07.2006 | SK   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 20.07.2006 | TR   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2003118015 (GUNNARSSON MAGNUS [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0028] ** figures 1-5 * | International search | [X]US2003081567 (OKANOUE KAZUHIRO [JP], et al); | [AP]US2004105434 (BAW ALLAN [US]) | Examination | WO0152567 | WO02062094 | US6597911 | - "3rd Generation Partnership Project;Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network;Radio Resource Control (RRC) protocol specification(Release 1999)", 3GPP DRAFT; 25331-3G0, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20031002), vol. RAN WG2, no. Sophia Antipolis, France; 20031002, XP050124386 |