EP1688306 - VEHICLE ROOF ANTENNA INSTALLATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HARADA INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 17-13, Minamiohi 4-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0013 / JP | [2006/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKANO, Kazuya c/o HARADA INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 17-13, Minamichi 4-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0013 / JP | 02 /
MAEDA, Hiroyuki c/o HARADA INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 17-13, Minamichi 4-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0013 / JP | 03 /
ISHIBAYASHI, Katsushiro c/o HARADA INDUSTRY CO., L 17-13, Minamichi 4-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0013 / JP | 04 /
NAGASAWA, Satoshi c/o HARADA INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 17-13, Minamichi 4-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140 0013 / JP | [2006/32] | Representative(s) | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/12] | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2006/32] | Moir, Michael Christopher, et al Mathys & Squire, 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04819419.5 | 25.11.2004 | [2006/32] | WO2004JP17506 | Priority number, date | JP20030394607 | 25.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003394607 | [2006/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005051720 | Date: | 09.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1688306 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1688306 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60R11/02, H01Q1/32 | [2007/04] | CPC: |
H01Q1/3275 (EP,US);
H01Q1/1207 (EP,US);
F16B2200/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/32] | B60R11/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2007/09] |
Former [2006/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGDACHANTENNENINSTALLATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2006/32] | English: | VEHICLE ROOF ANTENNA INSTALLATION DEVICE | [2006/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR INSTALLER UNE ANTENNE DE TOIT POUR VEHICULES | [2006/32] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2005 | Translation filed | 27.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2005 | Search fee paid | 27.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2005 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 04.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE19856056 (SIHN JR KG WILHELM [DE]) [Y] 3,4,7-10* the whole document *; | [Y]EP1152479 (NIPPON ANTENNA KK [JP]) [Y] 1-4,7-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE20117628U (TECHCOM CARCOMMUNIKATION AG [DE]) [Y] 3,4,7-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO03032436 (TYCO ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) [Y] 1-4,7-10 * page 7, line 10 - page 15, line 20; figures 9-14 *; | [XP]WO03107477 (CENTURION WIRELESS TECH INC [US], et al) [XP] 1,3-6,8,10 * paragraphs [0045] - [0048]; figures 6,7,10 * | International search | [A]JP2001036315 (NIPPON ANTENNA KK); | [A]JP2002164721 (KOJIMA PRESS KOGYO KK) | by applicant | JP2001036315 | WO03032436 |