EP1693672 - METHOD OF DETECTING SUBSTANCE TO BE ANALYZED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2006/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANUKI, Hiromi 2824-1-A-806, Nara-cho, Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 227-0036 / JP | 02 /
SAKAMOTO, Hiroko 5-8-8-504, Higashigotanda, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0022 / JP | 03 /
FUKUOKA, Morinao 1-13-1-409, Higashi-Fuchinobe Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 229-0003 / JP | [2006/34] | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/34] | von Hellfeld, Axel Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04819444.3 | 26.11.2004 | [2006/34] | WO2004JP17587 | Priority number, date | JP20030398835 | 28.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003398835 | JP20040082399 | 22.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004082399 | [2006/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005052583 | Date: | 09.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1693672 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, G01N33/58 | [2008/23] | CPC: |
G01N33/557 (EP,US);
G01N33/54306 (EP,US);
G01N33/581 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/34] | G01N33/543 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS EINER ZU ANALYSIERENDEN SUBSTANZ | [2006/34] | English: | METHOD OF DETECTING SUBSTANCE TO BE ANALYZED | [2006/34] | French: | PROCEDE SERVANT A DETECTER UNE SUBSTANCE A ANALYSER | [2006/34] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2006 | Translation filed | 31.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2006 | Search fee paid | 31.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 05.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 23.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0216177 (TOYO SODA MFG CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 *abstract, page 3, line 29 - page 4, line 14, page 7, lines 19-25* [Y] 12-15,29; | [XY]US5583055 (OH CHAN S [US], et al) [X] 1 *abstract, column 5, lines 8-44* [Y] 12-15,29; | [XY]US5583001 (BOBROW MARK N [US], et al) [X] 2-11,16-23,26,27,30 *abstract, column 5* [Y] 12-15,24,25,29; | [XY]US5731158 (BOBROW MARK NORMAN [US], et al) [X] 2-11,16-23,26,27,30 * claims 1-16 * [Y] 12-15,24,25,29; | [XY]US2002095073 (JACOBS ALICE A [US], et al) [X] 2-11,16-23,26-28,30 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0014] , [0098] * [Y] 12-15,24,25,29; | [XY] - BOBROW, M.N. AND MOEN, P.T., "Tyramide Signal Amplification (TSA) Systems for the Enhancement of ISH Signals in Cytogenetics", CURRENT PROTOCOLS IN CYTOMETRY, UNIT 8.9, (200001), no. supplement11, pages 8.9.1 - 8.9.16, XP002477763 [X] 31,32 * the whole document * [Y] 24,25 | International search | [X]JPS6250662 (TOYO SODA MFG CO LTD); | [X]WO02059372 (BIOCEPT INC [US], et al) |