EP1688875 - CONTENT DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM AND CONTENT LICENSE MANAGEMENT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2015 [2015/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | |||
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMOJI, Tatsuya 30-3-1102, Miiminamimachi, Neyagawa-shi Osaka 572-0019 / JP | 02 /
KAGEMOTO, Hideki 3-8-4, Aogakidai, Nara-shi Nara 631-0053 / JP | 03 /
DEWA, Yoshiharu c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa, 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 04 /
KITAZATO, Naohisa c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa, 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 05 /
KATAYAMA, Yasushi c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa, 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2006/32] | Representative(s) | Gassner, Wolfgang, et al Dr. Gassner & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Marie-Curie-Strasse 1 91052 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Gassner, Wolfgang, et al Dr. Gassner & Partner Patentanwälte Marie-Curie-Strasse 1 91052 Erlangen / DE | ||
Former [2006/32] | Gassner, Wolfgang, et al Dr. Gassner & Partner Nägelsbachstrasse 49a 91052 Erlangen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04819449.2 | 26.11.2004 | [2006/32] | WO2004JP17601 | Priority number, date | JP20030397863 | 27.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003397863 | [2006/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005052831 | Date: | 09.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1688875 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00 | [2011/49] | CPC: |
G06F21/105 (EP,US);
G06F15/00 (KR);
G06F17/00 (KR);
G06F21/10 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2137 (EP,US);
Y10S705/901 (US);
Y10S705/902 (US);
Y10S705/904 (US);
Y10S705/908 (US);
Y10S705/911 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/32] | G06Q10/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/10] |
Former [2006/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | INHALTSVERTEILUNGSSYSTEME UND INHALTSLIZENZ-VERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN | [2006/32] | English: | CONTENT DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM AND CONTENT LICENSE MANAGEMENT METHOD | [2006/32] | French: | SYSTEME DE DIFFUSION DE CONTENUS ET PROCEDE DE GESTION DE LICENCES DE CONTENUS | [2006/32] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2006 | Translation filed | 11.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 23.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/52] | 03.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.02.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6138119 (HALL EDWIN J [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002184517 (TADAYON BIJAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002194134 (OHTSUKA SHUICHI [JP]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]US2003115144 (STEFIK MARK J [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0315] - paragraph [0323] * * figures 7, 8, 11 * | International search | [A]JPH08263439 (XEROX CORP); | [A]JP2002230209 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN) |