EP1698040 - SWITCHED DC ELECTRICAL MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Precursor Engineering Pty Ltd 48 Bucktin Street Collie Western Australia 6225 / AU | [2006/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EARNSHAW, Dennis Charles 48 Bucktin Street Collie, Western Australia 6225 / AU | [2006/36] | Representative(s) | Murray, Elisabeth Anne, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | Murray, Elisabeth Anne, et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04819564.8 | 03.12.2004 | [2006/36] | WO2004AU01643 | Priority number, date | AU20030906717 | 05.12.2003 Original published format: AU 2003906717 | [2006/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005055400 | Date: | 16.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1698040 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 16.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H02K29/00, H02P6/00, H02K1/22, H02K13/00, H02K15/03, H02P7/14 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
H02K11/33 (EP,US);
H02K19/26 (KR);
H02K19/24 (KR);
H02K25/00 (EP,US);
H02K29/10 (EP,US);
H02P7/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/36] | H02K29/00, H02P6/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESCHALTETER ELEKTRISCHER GLEICHSTROMMOTOR | [2006/36] | English: | SWITCHED DC ELECTRICAL MACHINE | [2006/36] | French: | MACHINE ELECTRIQUE CC COMMUTEE | [2006/36] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2006 | Search fee paid | 05.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 05.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 07.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/35] | 04.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2008537 (GRADL R) [Y] 1-26 * page 5, paragraph 4; figure 1 * * page 5, paragraph 2 *; | [Y]JPS58212394 (TOYODA CHUO KENKYUSHO KK) [Y] 1-26 * figures 4,5,10 *; | [Y]EP0448505 (HILTI AG [LI]) [Y] 1-26 * figures 2-6 *; | [Y]DE10118004 (VALEO EQUIP ELECTR MOTEUR [FR]) [Y] 1,13,14 * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE10056556 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-26* figures 1-12 *; | [Y]JP2002171723 (DENSO CORP) [Y] 1-26 * abstract *; | [Y]WO03041242 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [Y] 1,13,14 * figures 1,9 * | International search | [X]US4025831 (WEBB ROBERT L); | [X]US4475068 (BRAILSFORD HARRISON D [US]); | [X]CA1191543 (MAGNET MOTOR GMBH); | [X]EP0148347 ; | [X]WO9120120 (NAHIRNEY PETER MICHAEL [CA]); | [X]US5179307 (PORTER RICHARD L [US]); | [X]JP2002084725 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) |