EP1720117 - USER AUTHENTIFICATION INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM, USER AUTHENTIFICATION SECURITY CARD, AND USER AUTHENTIFICATION SECURITY CARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.01.2009 [2009/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kokusai Medicom Kabushikikaisha 5-11-1, Shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0022 / JP | [2006/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANEDA, Takuya 3-6, Tenjincho, Hachiouji-shi Tokyo 192-0047 / JP | [2006/45] | Representative(s) | Schneider, Günther Martin Bettinger Schneider Schramm Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 02 67 81629 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/45] | Schneider, Günther Martin Bettinger Schneider Schramm, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 86 02 67 81629 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04819969.9 | 08.12.2004 | [2006/45] | WO2004JP18295 | Priority number, date | JP408452 | 08.12.2003 Original published format: JP 408452 | [2006/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005055131 | Date: | 16.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1720117 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/00, G06K17/00, G06F15/00 | [2006/45] | CPC: |
G06K19/16 (EP,US);
G06K19/00 (KR);
G06K17/00 (KR);
G06K19/07 (KR);
G06K19/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BENUTZERAUTHENTIFIKATIONS-INFORMATIONSAUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM, BENUTZERAUTHENTIFIKATIONS-SICHERHEITSKARTE UND BENUTZERAUTHENTIFIKATIONS-SICHERHEITSKARTE | [2006/45] | English: | USER AUTHENTIFICATION INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM, USER AUTHENTIFICATION SECURITY CARD, AND USER AUTHENTIFICATION SECURITY CARD | [2006/45] | French: | SUPPORT D'INFORMATION POUR AUTHENTIFICATION D'UTILISATEUR CARTE D'AUTHENTIFICATION D'UTILISATEUR | [2006/45] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2006 | Translation filed | 10.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2006 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/45] | 01.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/04] | 14.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2002032002 (KOKUSAI MEDICOM KK); | [Y]JP2003296691 (BANK OF TOKYO MITSUBISHI LTD); | [X]JP2003174442 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [Y]JP2003215319 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) |