EP1692749 - HIGH-REPETITION LASER SYSTEM FOR GENERATING ULTRA-SHORT PULSES ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLE OF CAVITY DUMPING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/34] | HIGH-REPETITION LASER SYSTEM FOR GENERATING ULTRA-SHORT PULSES ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLE OF PULSE DECOUPLING | ||
[2007/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2008 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.2009 [2009/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states High Q Laser Production GmbH Kaiser-Franz-Josef-Str. 61 6845 Hohenems / AT | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states High Q Laser Production GmbH Kaiser-Franz-Josef-Str.61 6845 Hohenems / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOPF, Daniel Schulgasse 11 A-6832 Röthis / AT | 02 /
LEDERER, Maximilian, Josef Schwarzen 687 A-6861 Alberschwende / AT | 03 /
MORGNER, Uwe Welfengarten, 1 30167 Hannover / DE | [2007/10] |
Former [2006/52] | 01 /
KOPF, Daniel Sandholzerstr. 14 A-6844 Altach / AT | ||
02 /
LEDERER, Maximilian, Josef Schwarzen 687 A-6861 Alberschwende / AT | |||
03 /
MORGNER, Uwe Welfengarten, 1 30167 Hannover / DE | |||
Former [2006/41] | 01 /
KOPF, Daniel Sandholzerstr. 14 A-6844 Altach / AT | ||
02 /
LEDERER, Maximilian, Josef Schwarzen 687 A-6861 Alberschwende / AT | |||
03 /
MORGNER, Uwe Herzstrasse, 16 30827 Berenbostel / DE | |||
Former [2006/34] | 01 /
KOPF, Daniel Sandholzerstr. 14 A-6844 Altach / AT | ||
02 /
LEDERER, Maximilian, Josef Schwarzen 687 A-6861 Alberschwende / AT | |||
03 /
MORGNER, Uwe Woerthestr. 1 c 76776 Neuburg/Rhein / DE | Representative(s) | Harmann, Bernd-Günther Kaminski Harmann Patentanwälte AG Landstrasse 124 9490 Vaduz / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | Harmann, Bernd-Günther Büchel, Kaminski & Partner Patentanwälte Est. Austrasse 79 9490 Vaduz / LI | Application number, filing date | 04820063.8 | 10.12.2004 | [2006/34] | WO2004EP14078 | Priority number, date | US20030528216P | 10.12.2003 Original published format: US 528216 P | US20040586735P | 12.07.2004 Original published format: US 586735 P | [2006/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005057741 | Date: | 23.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1692749 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1692749 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/115, // H01S3/098 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
H01S3/1103 (EP,US);
H01S3/1115 (EP,US);
H01S3/1118 (EP,US);
H01S2301/085 (EP,US);
H01S3/0604 (EP,US);
H01S3/061 (EP,US);
H01S3/08004 (EP,US);
H01S3/0813 (EP,US);
H01S3/09415 (EP,US);
H01S3/10038 (EP,US);
H01S3/10046 (EP,US);
H01S3/107 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/34] | H01S3/115 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/12] |
Former [2006/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHREPETIERENDES LASERSYSTEM ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON ULTRAKURZEN PULSEN NACH DEM PRINZIP DER PULS-AUSKOPPLUNG | [2006/34] | English: | HIGH-REPETITION LASER SYSTEM FOR GENERATING ULTRA-SHORT PULSES ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLE OF CAVITY DUMPING | [2007/37] | French: | SYSTEME LASER A TAUX DE REPETITION ELEVE POUR LA PRODUCTION D'IMPULSIONS ULTRACOURTES SELON LE PRINCIPE DE LA DECHARGE DE LA CAVITE | [2007/37] |
Former [2006/34] | HIGH-REPETITION LASER SYSTEM FOR GENERATING ULTRA-SHORT PULSES ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLE OF PULSE DECOUPLING | ||
Former [2006/34] | SYSTEME LASER A TAUX DE REPETITION ELEVE POUR LA PRODUCTION D'IMPULSIONS ULTRACOURTES SELON LE PRINCIPE DU DECOUPLAGE D'IMPULSIONS | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 02.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5848080 (DAHM JONATHAN S [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 1, lines 5-21 * * column 3, lines 10-16 * * column 4, line 6 - column 6, line 12 * [Y] 2-12; | [XY]US5870421 (DAHM JONATHAN S [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 2-12; | [XY]EP0949730 (JMAR TECHNOLOGY COMPANY [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0010] - [0020] - [0026] , [0027] , [0032] * [Y] 2-12; | [A]US4896119 (WILLIAMSON STEVEN L [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * | [X] - RAYBAUT P ET AL, "Diode-pumped 100-fs lasers based on a new apatite-structure crystal : Yb<3+>:SrY4(SiO4)3O", LASERS AND ELECTRO-OPTICS EUROPE, 2003. CLEO/EUROPE. 2003 CONFERENCE ON MUNICH, GERMANY 22-27 JUNE 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20030622), ISBN 0-7803-7734-6, pages 423 - 423, XP010711980 [X] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CLEOE.2003.1313486 | [X] - GLOSTER L A W ET AL, "Diode-pumped Q-switched Yb:S-FAP laser", OPTICS COMMUNICATIONS, NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING CO. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19980115), vol. 146, no. 1-6, ISSN 0030-4018, pages 177 - 180, XP004119416 [X] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0030-4018(97)00543-9 |