EP1710557 - DEVICE FOR MEASURING FILTER PRESSURE LOSS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.02.2016 [2016/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [2015/09] |
Former [2006/41] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKASHITA, Satoshi NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Mitsuo NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [2014/41] |
Former [2006/41] | 01 /
SAKASHITA, Satoshi NGK Insulators, Ltd., 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 4678530 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKAHASHI, Mitsuo NGK Insulators, Ltd., 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 4678530 / JP | Representative(s) | Naylor, Matthew John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/09] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2006/41] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 04820123.0 | 25.11.2004 | [2006/41] | WO2004JP17478 | Priority number, date | JP20030414291 | 12.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003414291 | [2006/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005057184 | Date: | 23.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1710557 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1710557 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/08, B01D46/42, F01N3/00, F01N3/02 | [2006/41] | CPC: |
B01D46/446 (EP,US);
B01D46/0086 (EP,US);
B01D46/4272 (EP,US);
B01D2279/30 (EP,US);
G01N2015/1493 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2007/12] |
Former [2006/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG DES FILTERDRUCKVERLUSTS | [2006/41] | English: | DEVICE FOR MEASURING FILTER PRESSURE LOSS | [2006/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE LA PERTE DE PRESSION D'UN FILTRE | [2006/41] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2006 | Translation filed | 23.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/41] | 08.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3111318 (BAT CIGARETTENFAB GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 2 and description thereof *; | [XI]US4651557 (CHOLET GEORGES [FR]) [X] 1,4 * figure 3 and description thereof * [I] 3; | [A]DE10052953 (AVL LIST GMBH [AT]) [A] 2* figure 3 and description thereof *; | [X]JP2001305042 (SHIBATA KAGAKU KK, et al) [X] 1,4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] , [0018] , [0021]; figure 1 * | International search | [A]JPS61149841 (TOKYO KEIKI KK); | [A]JPH0737932B ; | [A]JPH0985386 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD); | [A]JPH1090160 (SHINAGAWA REFRACTORIES CO); | [A]JP3372097B | by applicant | US4651557 | JP2001305042 |